Robert Taylor v. Ricky Hughes, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: ROBERT A. TAYLOR
Defendant / Appellee: KEVIN R. JOHNSON, RUSSELL E. WHITE, JR., JOSHUA WEITZMAN, CITY OF CHICAGO, RICKY A. HUGHES and KENNETH J. YAKES
Case Number: 20-2377
Filed: July 27, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 12/02/2020 for Robert A. Taylor. Appellees' brief due on or before 01/19/2021 for City of Chicago, Ricky A. Hughes, Kevin R. Johnson, Joshua Weitzman, Russell E. White Jr. and Kenneth J. Yakes. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 02/16/2021 for Appellant Robert A. Taylor. RJS [7109329] [20-2377] (AG) [Entered: 09/21/2020 03:52 PM]
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 10/13/2020 for Robert A. Taylor. Appellees' brief due on or before 11/13/2020 for City of Chicago, Ricky A. Hughes, Kevin R. Johnson, Joshua Weitzman, Russell E. White Jr. and Kenneth J. Yakes. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 12/04/2020 for Appellant Robert A. Taylor. RJS [7101031] [20-2377] (MM) [Entered: 08/14/2020 11:38 AM]
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 10/02/2020 for Robert A. Taylor. Appellees' brief due on or before 11/02/2020 for City of Chicago, Ricky A. Hughes, Kevin R. Johnson, Joshua Weitzman, Russell E. White Jr. and Kenneth J. Yakes. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 11/23/2020 for Appellant Robert A. Taylor. RJS [7100782] [20-2377] (AG) [Entered: 08/13/2020 12:13 PM]
August 4, 2020 Filing 6 Appearance form filed by Attorney Stephen Collins for Appellees Kenneth J. Yakes, City of Chicago, Ricky A. Hughes, Kevin R. Johnson, Joshua Weitzman and Russell E. White, Jr.. Additional Parties: Shawn J. Pickett; Richard E. Peck; Thomas B. Lieber; Scott M. McWilliams; Yolanda Collier. [6] [7098593] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [20-2377]-[Edited 08/04/2020 by CG to reflect the termination and addition of counsel.] (Collins, Stephen) [Entered: 08/04/2020 03:48 PM]
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 09/14/2020 for Robert A. Taylor. Appellee's brief due on or before 10/14/2020 for City of Chicago, Ricky A. Hughes, Kevin R. Johnson, Joshua Weitzman, Russell E. White Jr. and Kenneth J. Yakes. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 11/04/2020 for Appellant Robert A. Taylor. RJS [7097690] [20-2377] (FP) [Entered: 07/31/2020 12:57 PM]
July 31, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Friday, August 14, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. RJS. [4] [7097688] [20-2377] (FP) [Entered: 07/31/2020 12:54 PM]
July 30, 2020 Filing 3 Appearance form filed by Attorney MYRIAM ZRECZNY KASPER for Appellees City of Chicago, Ricky A. Hughes, Kevin R. Johnson, Joshua Weitzman, Russell E. White, Jr. and Kenneth J. Yakes. Additional Parties: SHAWN J. PICKETT, RICHARD E. PECK, JR., THOMAS B. LIEBER, SCOTT. M. MCWILLIAMS, YOLANDA R. COLLIER, JOSHUA WEITZMAN. [3] [7097402] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [20-2377] [3] [7097402] [20-2377]--[Edited 07/30/2020 by CMD to reflect termination and addition of counsel.] (Kasper, Myriam) [Entered: 07/30/2020 12:33 PM]
July 27, 2020 Filing 2 THIS CAUSE CONSISTS OF MORE THAN 5 PARTIES FOR EITHER SIDE. The following are those parties to this cause as reflected on the District Court docket, yet are not reflected on the Appellate docket/caption for administrative purposes: APPELLEES Shawn J. Pickett, Richard E. Peck, Jr., Thomas B. Lieber, Scott. M. McWilliams, and Yolanda R. Collier. [2] [7096633] [20-2377]--[Text updated 07/29/2020 by JR.] (AG) [Entered: 07/28/2020 10:21 AM]
July 27, 2020 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 08/10/2020. Appellant's brief due on or before 09/08/2020 for Robert A. Taylor [1] [7096628] [20-2377] (AG) [Entered: 07/28/2020 10:13 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Robert Taylor v. Ricky Hughes, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROBERT A. TAYLOR
Represented By: Irene K. Dymkar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KEVIN R. JOHNSON
Represented By: Myriam Z. Kasper
Represented By: Stephen G. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RUSSELL E. WHITE, JR.
Represented By: Myriam Z. Kasper
Represented By: Stephen G. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOSHUA WEITZMAN
Represented By: Myriam Z. Kasper
Represented By: Stephen G. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY OF CHICAGO
Represented By: Myriam Z. Kasper
Represented By: Stephen G. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RICKY A. HUGHES
Represented By: Myriam Z. Kasper
Represented By: Stephen G. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KENNETH J. YAKES
Represented By: Myriam Z. Kasper
Represented By: Stephen G. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?