James Stewart v. Credit Control, LLC, et al
Defendant / Appellee: CREDIT CONTROL, LLC, LVNV FUNDING, LLC, RESURGENT CAPITAL SERVICES, L.P. and EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.
Plaintiff / Appellant: JAMES STEWART
Case Number: 20-2466
Filed: August 7, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file appellant's brief. [ # 7 ] Appellant's brief due on or before 10/19/2020 for James Stewart. Appellees' briefs due on or before 11/18/2020 for Credit Control, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., LVNV Funding, LLC and Resurgent Capital Services, L.P.. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 12/09/2020 for Appellant James Stewart. CMD [8] [7109594] [20-2466] (ZNS) [Entered: 09/22/2020 02:16 PM]
September 21, 2020 Filing 7 Pro se motion filed by Appellant James Stewart to extend time to file appellant's brief. [7] [7109284] [20-2466] (CAH) [Entered: 09/21/2020 02:24 PM]
September 11, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE: Circuit Rule 46(a) requires lead counsel be admitted to practice within 30 days of the date the appeal/petition was docketed. The rule also requires any attorney wishing to present oral argument to be admitted. Our records indicate as of this date Attorney Jamie N. Ward for Appellee Experian Information Solutions, Inc. has/have not been admitted to practice in this court. Within 21 days, please file your application for admission by going to: http://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/forms/forms7.htm and choosing the link, "Application for Admission to Practice in the Seventh Circuit". [6] [7107002] [20-2466] (LJ) [Entered: 09/11/2020 11:10 AM]
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This court received notice from the District Court that the appellant paid the required docketing fee. Briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 09/21/2020 for James Stewart. Appellee's brief due on or before 10/19/2020 for Credit Control, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., LVNV Funding, LLC and Resurgent Capital Services, L.P.. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 11/09/2020 for Appellant James Stewart [5] [7102354] [20-2466] (CM) [Entered: 08/20/2020 11:15 AM]
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 Filed notice from the District Court that the appeal docketing fee was received. [4] [7102351] [20-2466] (CM) [Entered: 08/20/2020 11:14 AM]
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Patrick A. Watts for Appellee Credit Control, LLC. [3] [7102224] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [20-2466] (Watts, Patrick) [Entered: 08/19/2020 08:04 PM]
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: A review of the short record reveals that this appeal involves more than one appellee represented by different counsel. Counsel for appellees are encouraged to file a joint brief and appendix or adopt parts of a co-appellee's brief. The parties are reminded that redundant and uncoordinated briefing will be stricken. See United States v. Torres, 170 F.3d 749 (7th Cir. 1999); United States v. Ashman, 964 F.2d 596 (7th Cir. 1992). DW [7100596] [2] [7100596] [20-2466] (AP) [Entered: 08/12/2020 04:09 PM]
August 7, 2020 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee due. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 08/21/2020. Fee or IFP forms due on 08/21/2020 for Appellant James Stewart. [1] [7099576] [20-2466] (ZNS) [Entered: 08/07/2020 01:56 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: James Stewart v. Credit Control, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CREDIT CONTROL, LLC
Represented By: Patrick A. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LVNV FUNDING, LLC
Represented By: Nabil G. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RESURGENT CAPITAL SERVICES, L.P.
Represented By: Nabil G. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.
Represented By: Jamie N. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JAMES STEWART
Represented By: James Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?