Leonard Hadley v. Dennis Larson, et al
Defendant / Appellee: DEBORAH HALE, Head Nurse, St. Clair County Jail, MELODY MURRY, Medical Employee, St. Clair County Jail and DENNIS LARSON, Medical Director, St. Clair County Jail
Plaintiff / Appellant: LEONARD HADLEY
Case Number: 20-2648
Filed: August 31, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2020 Filing 11 Filed district court order dated 10/20/2020, Pursuant to the October 16, 2020, order in appellate case no. 20-2648 from the United States Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit (Doc. [76]), the agency having custody of the plaintiff, Leonard Hadley, is directed to remit the appellate filing ($500.00) and docketing ($5.00) fee from his prison trust fund account if such funds are available. [11] [7116106] [20-2648] (CM) [Entered: 10/21/2020 09:06 AM]
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, filed on 9/29/20. Appellant Leonard Hadley has filed a motion to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal. This court has carefully reviewed the record on appeal, the district court's order pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) certifying that the appeal was filed in bad faith, and Hadley's filings in support of his motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Hadley appeals from the district court's order denying his motion for unlimited access to the prison's law library. Proceedings in the district court remain ongoing. Hadley has not appealed from a final order, the district court did not certify the order for interlocutory appeal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b), and there is no other possible jurisdictional basis for this appeal. Accordingly, the motion to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED, see Lee v. Clinton, 209 F.3d 1025 (7th Cir. 2000), and this appeal is DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction. Further, the district court shall collect the appellate filing fees for this appeal pursuant to the mechanism of 28 U.S.C. 1915(b). See Newlin v. Helman, 123 F.3d 429, 434 (7th Cir. 1997). Diane S. Sykes, Chief Circuit Judge; Joel M. Flaum, Circuit Judge and Michael B. Brennan, Circuit Judge. [10] [7115263] [20-2648] (FP) [Entered: 10/16/2020 11:02 AM]
September 28, 2020 Filing 9 PLRA Memorandum in support of Prose motion filed by Appellant Leonard Hadley to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. [9] [7111089] [20-2648]--[Edited 09/29/2020 by MM to correct type of filing.] (CAH) [Entered: 09/28/2020 04:30 PM]
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re: Motion for federal court order to provide unlimited clerk participated law library access. Pursuant to the courts Fee Order and Notice of August 31, 2020, the motion is DENIED without court action. [ # 5 ] SCR [8] [7109270] [20-2648] (ZNS) [Entered: 09/21/2020 02:05 PM]
September 17, 2020 Filing 7 Filed District Court order DENYING Appellant Leonard Hadley leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Date IFP denied: 09/17/2020. [7] [7108619] PLRA Fee/Motion/Memorandum due on 10/19/2020 [20-2648] (CM) [Entered: 09/17/2020 02:27 PM]
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: TRANSFERRING the motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis on appeal to the clerk of the District Court for ruling in the first instance. JR [6] [7108465] [20-2648] (MM) [Entered: 09/17/2020 09:44 AM]
September 16, 2020 Filing 5 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Leonard Hadley for federal court order to provide unlimited participation to law library. [5] [7108376] [20-2648] (CM) [Entered: 09/16/2020 04:43 PM]
September 16, 2020 Filing 4 Prose motion filed by Appellant Leonard Hadley to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. [4] [7108372] [20-2648] (CM) [Entered: 09/16/2020 04:40 PM]
September 10, 2020 Filing 3 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Kevin K. Peek for Appellees Deborah Hale, Dennis Larson and Melody Murry. [3] [7106734] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [20-2648] [3] [7106734] [20-2648]--[Edited 09/10/2020 by ZNS to reflect the addition of counsel] (Peek, Kevin) [Entered: 09/10/2020 12:02 PM]
September 10, 2020 Filing 2 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Rodney M. Sharp for Appellees Deborah Hale, Dennis Larson and Melody Murry. [2] [7106727] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [20-2648] (Sharp, Rodney) [Entered: 09/10/2020 11:48 AM]
August 31, 2020 Filing 1 State prisoner's civil rights case docketed. IT IS ORDERED that this appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Proceedings are SUSPENDED pending notification by the district court that any necessary fee has been assessed, and if assessed, paid. PLRA Fee due. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Leonard Hadley by 09/08/2020. PLRA Fee/Motion/Memorandum due on 09/30/2020. Transcript information sheet due by 09/14/2020. [1] [7104800] [20-2648] (MM) [Entered: 09/01/2020 10:53 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Leonard Hadley v. Dennis Larson, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEBORAH HALE, Head Nurse, St. Clair County Jail
Represented By: Rodney M. Sharp
Represented By: Kevin Peek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MELODY MURRY, Medical Employee, St. Clair County Jail
Represented By: Rodney M. Sharp
Represented By: Kevin Peek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DENNIS LARSON, Medical Director, St. Clair County Jail
Represented By: Rodney M. Sharp
Represented By: Kevin Peek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LEONARD HADLEY
Represented By: Leonard Hadley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?