Jeffery Mitchell v. Leonta Jackson
Respondent / Appellee: ANTHONY WILLIS and LEONTA JACKSON, Warden
Petitioner / Appellant: JEFFERY MITCHELL
Case Number: 20-2649
Filed: August 31, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2020 Filing 8 Filed Notice of Clerical Error by Appellant Jeffery Mitchell. [8] [7117328] [20-2649]--[Updated 10/29/2020 by JR to substitute respondent-appellee.] (CAH) [Entered: 10/26/2020 02:10 PM]
October 20, 2020 Filing 7 Filed notice of change of address for Jeffery Mitchell from Menard Correctional Center to Pontiac Correctional Center. [7] [7116169] [20-2649] (PS) [Entered: 10/21/2020 10:23 AM]
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re: Motion for Leave to Use Original Record on Appeal. [ # 4 ] The motion to use original record is GRANTED to the extent that, should this appeal proceed to briefing, the appellant will need to attach only the district court order under review to his opening brief. See Circuit Rule 30(a). CMD [6] [7110812] [20-2649] (MM) [Entered: 09/28/2020 09:44 AM]
September 25, 2020 Filing 5 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Jeffery Mitchell for appointment of counsel. [5] [7110659] [20-2649] (CAH) [Entered: 09/25/2020 03:33 PM]
September 25, 2020 Filing 4 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Jeffery Mitchell for leave to use original record on appeal. [4] [7110657] [20-2649] (CAH) [Entered: 09/25/2020 03:32 PM]
September 21, 2020 Filing 3 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Jeffery Mitchell for certificate of appealability. [3] [7109493] [20-2649] (PS) [Entered: 09/22/2020 10:34 AM]
September 2, 2020 Filing 2 Filed District Court order GRANTING Appellant Jeffery Mitchell leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Date IFP granted: 09/02/2020. [2] [7105126] [20-2649] (AP) [Entered: 09/02/2020 11:02 AM]
August 31, 2020 Filing 1 State prisoner's habeas corpus case docketed. Certificate of Appealability denied 06/22/2020. IFP pending in the District Court. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 09/14/2020. [1] [7104778] [20-2649] (CG) [Entered: 09/01/2020 10:23 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jeffery Mitchell v. Leonta Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: ANTHONY WILLIS
Represented By: Michael M. Glick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: LEONTA JACKSON, Warden
Represented By: Michael M. Glick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: JEFFERY MITCHELL
Represented By: Jeffery Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?