BenYeHudah Whitfield, II v. Leonta Jackson
Respondent / Appellee: LEONTA JACKSON, Warden
Petitioner / Appellant: BENYEHUDAH WHITFIELD, II
Case Number: 20-2728
Filed: September 10, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Filing 3 Filed notice from the District Court that the appeal docketing fee was received. [3] [7109848] [20-2728] (CM) [Entered: 09/23/2020 11:21 AM]
September 15, 2020 Filing 2 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Mr. BenYeHudah Whitfield, II. Prior or Related proceedings: Yes. Whitfield v. Howard, et al. 15-2649 [2] [7108032] [20-2728] (Whitfield, BenYeHudah) [Entered: 09/15/2020 09:52 PM]
September 10, 2020 Filing 1 State prisoner's habeas corpus case docketed. Certificate of Appealability denied 07/23/2013. Fee due. Docketing Statement due for Appellant BenYeHudah Whitfield II by 09/17/2020. Fee or IFP forms due on 09/24/2020 for Appellant BenYeHudah Whitfield II. Transcript information sheet due by 09/24/2020. [1] [7106969] [20-2728] (AG) [Entered: 09/11/2020 10:19 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: BenYeHudah Whitfield, II v. Leonta Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: LEONTA JACKSON, Warden
Represented By: Michael M. Glick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: BENYEHUDAH WHITFIELD, II
Represented By: BenYeHudah Whitfield II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?