Howard Wiley v. Leonta Jackson
Respondent / Appellee: LEONTA JACKSON, Warden
Petitioner / Appellant: HOWARD WILEY
Case Number: 20-2738
Filed: September 11, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re: Motion to dismiss. This cause is DISMISSED pursuant to F.R.A.P. 42(b). Mandate issued, no record to be returned. [ # 2 ][3][7109765] [20-2738] (AP) [Entered: 09/23/2020 09:53 AM]
September 23, 2020 FOR COURT USE ONLY: Certified copy of 09/23/2020 Final Order with Mandate sent to the District Court Clerk. [7109768-2] [7109768] [20-2738] (AP) [Entered: 09/23/2020 10:00 AM]
September 21, 2020 Filing 2 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Howard Wiley to dismiss case pursuant to FRAP 42(b) [2] [7109359] [20-2738] (MAN) [Entered: 09/21/2020 04:18 PM]
September 11, 2020 Filing 1 State prisoner's habeas corpus case docketed. Certificate of Appealability denied 11/14/2005. Fee due. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Howard Wiley by 09/18/2020. Fee or IFP forms due on 09/25/2020 for Appellant Howard Wiley. Transcript information sheet due by 09/25/2020. [1] [7107158] [20-2738] (MM) [Entered: 09/11/2020 03:41 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Howard Wiley v. Leonta Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: LEONTA JACKSON, Warden
Represented By: Michael M. Glick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: HOWARD WILEY
Represented By: Howard Wiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?