Timothy Tyler, et al v. Bank of America Corporation, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: STEPHANIE M. TYLER and TIMOTHY R. TYLER
Defendant / Appellee: BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, RESIDENTIAL CREDIT SOLUTIONS, INC. and BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION
Case Number: 20-3136
Filed: November 2, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing is SUSPENDED pending further court order. [12] JNS [7123109] [20-3136] (AP) [Entered: 11/20/2020 10:34 AM]
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Appellants shall file a complete statement of jurisdiction that includes the omitted information. The statement is due on or before November 30, 2020. (See order for details) DW [11] [7122631] [20-3136] (ER) [Entered: 11/18/2020 03:26 PM]
November 17, 2020 Filing 10 Docketing Statement filed by Appellants Stephanie M. Tyler and Timothy R. Tyler. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [10] [7122153] [20-3136] (AD) [Entered: 11/17/2020 10:23 AM]
November 9, 2020 Filing 9 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Natalie Burris for Appellees Bank of America Corporation and Bank of New York Mellon. [9] [7120611] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [20-3136] (Burris, Natalie) [Entered: 11/09/2020 04:41 PM]
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellants' brief due on or before 12/21/2020 for Stephanie M. Tyler and Timothy R. Tyler. Appellees' briefs due on or before 01/21/2021 for Bank of America Corporation, Bank of New York Mellon and Residential Credit Solutions, Inc. Appellants' reply brief, if any, is due on or before 02/11/2021 for Appellants Stephanie M. Tyler and Timothy R. Tyler. JNS [7120182] [20-3136] (MM) [Entered: 11/06/2020 02:15 PM]
November 6, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Thursday, November 19, 2020 at 2:00 p.m Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JNS [7] [7120180] [20-3136] (MM) [Entered: 11/06/2020 02:11 PM]
November 5, 2020 Filing 6 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Ryan M. Holz for Appellee Residential Credit Solutions, Inc.. [6] [7119931] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [20-3136] [Edited 11/05/2020 by AG to reflect addition of counsel] (Holz, Ryan) [Entered: 11/05/2020 03:49 PM]
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This court received notice from the District Court that the appellant paid the required docketing fee. Briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 12/07/2020 for Stephanie M. Tyler and Timothy R. Tyler. Appellee's brief due on or before 01/04/2021 for Bank of America Corporation, Bank of New York Mellon and Residential Credit Solutions, Inc.. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 01/25/2021 for Appellants Stephanie M. Tyler and Timothy R. Tyler [5] [7119787] [20-3136] (CM) [Entered: 11/05/2020 10:58 AM]
November 5, 2020 Filing 4 Filed notice from the District Court that the appeal docketing fee was received. [4] [7119786] [20-3136] (CM) [Entered: 11/05/2020 10:57 AM]
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: A review of the short record reveals that this appeal involves more than one appellee represented by different counsel. Counsel for appellees are encouraged to file a joint brief and appendix or adopt parts of a co-appellee's brief. The parties are reminded that redundant and uncoordinated briefing will be stricken. See United States v. Torres, 170 F.3d 749 (7th Cir. 1999); United States v. Ashman, 964 F.2d 596 (7th Cir. 1992). [7119316] [3] [7119316] [20-3136] (ZNS) [Entered: 11/03/2020 01:51 PM]
November 3, 2020 Filing 2 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Michael P. McGivney for Appellee Residential Credit Solutions, Inc.. [2] [7119302] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [20-3136] (McGivney, Michael) [Entered: 11/03/2020 01:19 PM]
November 2, 2020 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee due. Docketing Statement due for Appellants Stephanie M. Tyler and Timothy R. Tyler by 10/23/2020. Transcript information sheet due by 11/16/2020. Fee or IFP forms due on 11/16/2020 for Appellants Stephanie M. Tyler and Timothy R. Tyler. [1] [7119058] [20-3136] (MM) [Entered: 11/02/2020 04:33 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Timothy Tyler, et al v. Bank of America Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: STEPHANIE M. TYLER
Represented By: Timothy R. Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TIMOTHY R. TYLER
Represented By: Timothy R. Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON
Represented By: Natalie Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RESIDENTIAL CREDIT SOLUTIONS, INC.
Represented By: Michael McGivney
Represented By: Ryan M. Holz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION
Represented By: Natalie Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?