Theresa Garner v. DOJ, et al
Defendant / Appellee: MARK T. D'ALESSANDRO, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, BUREAU OF LABOR STATISTICS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General of the United States and JEFFREY A. ROSEN, Acting Attorney General of the United States
Plaintiff / Appellant: THERESA GARNER
Case Number: 20-3259
Filed: November 19, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2021 FOR COURT USE ONLY: Certified copy of 01/14/2021 Final Order with Mandate sent to the District Court Clerk. [7134787-2] [7134787] [20-3259] (AD) [Entered: 01/14/2021 04:59 PM]
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER issued DENYING Motion for Extension of Time and E-filing (Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(b) and 15(a)(13)). [ # 7 ] [ # 7 ] Appellant has failed to file an opening brief within the time required under Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 31(a) and her motion does not provide a sufficient basis for granting an extension. Accordingly, this appeal is DISMISSED for lack of prosecution. Mandate issued, no record to be returned. Frank H. Easterbrook, Circuit Judge. [8] [7134381] [20-3259]--[Edited 01/14/2021 by AD to reflect issuance of mandate.] (AD) [Entered: 01/13/2021 12:07 PM]
January 11, 2021 Filing 7 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Theresa Garner to extend time to file appellant's brief and to become an electronic filer. [7] [7133482] [20-3259] (CM) [Entered: 01/11/2021 08:43 AM]
January 8, 2021 Filing 6 Appellee William P. Barr in 20-3259 substituted by Appellee Jeffrey A. Rosen in 20-3259, pursuant to FRAP 43(c). [6] [7133414] [20-3259] (CMD) [Entered: 01/08/2021 03:28 PM]
January 7, 2021 Filing 5 Filed notice of change of address for Theresa Garner. [5] [7133015] [20-3259] (CAH) [Entered: 01/07/2021 11:49 AM]
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Appellant Theresa Garner is directed to file the overdue Docketing Statement within 14 days from the date of this Rule to Show Cause. Docketing statement response due for Appellant Theresa Garner by 12/21/2020. Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7019 0700 0000 6008 2183. [4] [7126514] [20-3259] (AD) [Entered: 12/07/2020 04:13 PM]
November 19, 2020 Filing 3 THIS CAUSE CONSISTS OF MORE THAN 5 PARTIES FOR EITHER SIDE. The following are those parties to this cause as reflected on the District Court docket, yet are not reflected on the Appellate docket/caption for administrative purposes: APPELLEES: Eugene Scalia, Department of Commerce, Bureau of Commerce, Secretary Wilbur Ross, Cleopatra Echols, Stephanie O'Connor, Julie Nelson, and Ana Ortiz. [3] [7123121] [20-3259] (ZNS) [Entered: 11/20/2020 10:50 AM]
November 19, 2020 Filing 2 This is notification that no appellee(s) or counsel for the appellee(s) were served in the District Court. [2] [7123118] (Note: The Office of the US Attorney has been notified of the filing of the appeal.) [20-3259] (ZNS) [Entered: 11/20/2020 10:44 AM]
November 19, 2020 Filing 1 U.S. civil case docketed. IFP. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Theresa Garner by 11/27/2020. Transcript information sheet due by 12/03/2020. Appellant's brief due on or before 12/29/2020 for Theresa Garner. [1] [7123107] [20-3259]--[Edited 11/20/2020 by ZNS] (ZNS) [Entered: 11/20/2020 10:32 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Theresa Garner v. DOJ, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARK T. D'ALESSANDRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BUREAU OF LABOR STATISTICS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General of the United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JEFFREY A. ROSEN, Acting Attorney General of the United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: THERESA GARNER
Represented By: Theresa Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?