Laurence Lovejoy v. Jacqueline Lashbrook
Plaintiff / Appellant: LAURENCE LOVEJOY
Defendant / Appellee: JACQUELINE LASHBROOK
Case Number: 20-3277
Filed: November 24, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2021 Filing 5 Prose motion filed by Appellant Laurence Lovejoy to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. [5] [7131887] [20-3277] (CM) [Entered: 01/04/2021 03:29 PM]
December 14, 2020 Filing 4 Filed District Court order DENYING Appellant Laurence Lovejoy leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Date IFP denied: 12/14/2020. [4] [7128173] PLRA Fee/Motion/Memorandum due on 01/13/2021 [20-3277] (CM) [Entered: 12/14/2020 11:25 AM]
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: re: Motion for appointment of counsel. [ # 2 ] This appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act and therefore all proceedings are suspended pending the assessment and payment of any necessary fees. See Newlin v. Helman, 123 F.3d 429, 434 (7th Cir. 1997). A review of the docket indicates that the appellant's motion for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis is currently pending before the district court. Accordingly, to the extent that the appellant seeks recruitment of counsel, the motion is DENIED without court action, pursuant to this court's fee notice and order dated November 24, 2020. [3] [7123989] SCR [20-3277] (CG) [Entered: 11/25/2020 08:41 AM]
November 24, 2020 Filing 2 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Laurence Lovejoy for appointment of counsel. [2] [7123871] [20-3277] (AD) [Entered: 11/24/2020 02:40 PM]
November 24, 2020 Filing 1 State prisoner's civil rights case docketed. IT IS ORDERED that this appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Proceedings are SUSPENDED pending notification by the district court that any necessary fee has been assessed, and if assessed, paid. PLRA IFP pending in the District Court. Transcript information sheet due by 12/08/2020. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Laurence Lovejoy by 12/01/2020. [1] [7123859] [20-3277] (AD) [Entered: 11/24/2020 02:23 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Laurence Lovejoy v. Jacqueline Lashbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LAURENCE LOVEJOY
Represented By: Laurence Lovejoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JACQUELINE LASHBROOK
Represented By: Nadine J. Wichern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?