Willie Simpson v. Jon Litscher, et al
Defendant / Appellee: SCOTT WALKER, GREEN BAY CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION, TONY EVERS, KEVIN CARR and JON E. LITSCHER
Plaintiff / Appellant: WILLIE C. SIMPSON
Case Number: 20-3293
Filed: November 25, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file appellant's brief [ # 8 ] Appellant's brief due on or before 03/05/2021 for Willie C. Simpson. Appellee's brief due on or before 04/05/2021 for Kevin Carr, Tony Evers, Green Bay Correctional Institution, Jon E. Litscher and Scott Walker. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 04/26/2021 for Appellant Willie C. Simpson CMD [9] [7134823] [20-3293] (AP) [Entered: 01/15/2021 09:09 AM]
January 14, 2021 Filing 8 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Willie C. Simpson to extend time to file appellant's brief. [8] [7134747] [20-3293] (CM) [Entered: 01/14/2021 03:45 PM]
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file appellant's brief. [ # 6 ] Appellant's brief due on or before 02/03/2021 for Willie C. Simpson. Appellees' brief due on or before 03/05/2021 for Kevin Carr, Tony Evers, Green Bay Correctional Institution, Jon E. Litscher and Scott Walker. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 03/26/2021 for Appellant Willie C. Simpson. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any transcript information sheet is due by January 12, 2021. CMD [7] [7128252] [20-3293] (AG) [Entered: 12/14/2020 02:29 PM]
December 11, 2020 Filing 6 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Willie C. Simpson to extend time to file appellant's brief. [6] [7128021] [20-3293] (DRS) [Entered: 12/11/2020 04:36 PM]
December 11, 2020 Filing 5 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Willie C. Simpson. [5] [7128017] [20-3293] (DRS) [Entered: 12/11/2020 04:31 PM]
December 4, 2020 Filing 4 Appearance form filed by Attorney Hannah S. Jurss for Appellees Kevin Carr, Tony Evers, Green Bay Correctional Institution, Jon E. Litscher and Scott Walker. Additional Parties: Captain Vanlanan, Captain Elsinger, Sergeant Weycker, Sergeant Hert, Sergeant Friedel, Sergeant Retlaff, Co Korpitta, CO FruiBrodtte, CO Diedrick, CO Ernie, CO Lueteman, Jean Lutsey, Sue Peters, and Captain Bauman. [4] [7125922] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [20-3293] [4] [7125922] [20-3293]--[Edited 12/04/2020 by ZNS to reflect the termination and addition of counsel] (Jurss, Hannah) [Entered: 12/04/2020 01:03 PM]
December 2, 2020 Filing 3 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Willie C. Simpson. [3] [7125245] [20-3293] (AG) [Entered: 12/02/2020 11:18 AM]
November 25, 2020 Filing 2 THIS CAUSE CONSISTS OF MORE THAN 5 PARTIES FOR EITHER SIDE. The following are those parties to this cause as reflected on the District Court docket, yet are not reflected on the Appellate docket/caption for administrative purposes: APPELLEES: Captain Vanlanan, Captain Elsinger, Sergeant Weycker, Sergeant Hert, Sergeant Friedel, Sergeant Retlaff, Co Korpitta, CO FruiBrodtte, CO Deidrick, CO Ernie, CO Lueterman, Jean Lutsey, Sue Peters, and Captain Bauman. [2] [7124729] [20-3293] (ZNS) [Entered: 12/01/2020 09:01 AM]
November 25, 2020 Filing 1 State prisoner's civil rights case docketed. Fee Paid. Docketing statement filed. Appellant's brief due on or before 01/04/2021 for Willie C. Simpson. Transcript information sheet due by 12/09/2020. [1] [7124719] [20-3293] (ZNS) [Entered: 12/01/2020 08:51 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Willie Simpson v. Jon Litscher, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SCOTT WALKER
Represented By: Hannah S. Jurss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GREEN BAY CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION
Represented By: Hannah S. Jurss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TONY EVERS
Represented By: Hannah S. Jurss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KEVIN CARR
Represented By: Hannah S. Jurss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JON E. LITSCHER
Represented By: Hannah S. Jurss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WILLIE C. SIMPSON
Represented By: Willie C. Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?