Huguette Young v. Kwame Raoul
Defendant / Appellee: KWAME RAOUL
Plaintiff / Appellant: HUGUETTE NICOLE YOUNG
Case Number: 21-1109
Filed: January 20, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2021 Filing 13 Jurisdictional Statement filed by Appellant Huguette Nicole Young. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [13] [7144817] [21-1109] (AD) [Entered: 03/02/2021 12:52 PM]
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Appellant Huguette Nicole Young is directed to file the overdue Docketing Statement within 14 days from the date of this Rule to Show Cause. Docketing statement response due for Appellant Huguette Nicole Young by 02/19/2021. [12] [7139713] [21-1109] (AD) [Entered: 02/05/2021 08:55 AM]
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re: Motion to proceed to file fee waiver request, filed on 2/1/2021. A review of the docket indicates that the appellant's motion to proceed in forma pauperis is currently pending before the district court. Accordingly, the appellants motion will be filed without court action. If the district court denies the pending motion, the appellant may renew her request with this court, using the proper asset affidavit form. A further review of the docket indicates that on February 1, 2021, the clerk received the appellants brief and accepted it for filing. CMD [11] [7139420] [21-1109] (FP) [Entered: 02/03/2021 04:38 PM]
February 3, 2021 Filing 10 Notification from the District Court that a motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis is pending. [10] [7139219] [21-1109] (MM) [Entered: 02/03/2021 11:19 AM]
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order issued TRANSFERRING the motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis on appeal to the clerk of the District Court for ruling in the first instance. JR [9] [7139061] [21-1109] (CG) [Entered: 02/02/2021 03:59 PM]
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order issued DENYING motion to become an electronic filer. Appellant has already submitted her brief, and no appellees are currently participating in this appeal, so she will not be required to file many additional documents. Appellant is warned that unnecessary or frivolous filings may result in sanctions. [ # 3 ] JPK [8] [7138640] [21-1109] Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7019 0140 0000 6080 1245. [8] [7138640] [21-1109] (FP) [Entered: 02/01/2021 03:53 PM]
February 1, 2021 Filing 7 1 copy Appellant's brief filed by Appellant Huguette Nicole Young. Electronically Transmitted. [7] [7138368] [21-1109] (CAH) [Entered: 02/01/2021 09:01 AM]
February 1, 2021 Filing 6 Prose motion filed by Appellant Huguette Nicole Young to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. [6] [7138365] [21-1109] (CAH) [Entered: 02/01/2021 08:54 AM]
February 1, 2021 Filing 5 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Huguette Nicole Young to proceed to file fee waiver request and opening brief beyond missed deadlines. [5] [7138364] [21-1109] (CAH) [Entered: 02/01/2021 08:53 AM]
January 28, 2021 Filing 4 Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance filed by Appellant Huguette Nicole Young. [4] [7138029] [21-1109]--[Edited 01/29/2021 by AD to reflect proper document filed.] (CAH) [Entered: 01/29/2021 08:48 AM]
January 28, 2021 Filing 3 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Huguette Nicole Young to become an electronic filer. [3] [7137743] [21-1109] (CAH) [Entered: 01/28/2021 10:49 AM]
January 20, 2021 Filing 2 This is notification that no appellee(s) or counsel for the appellee(s) were served in the District Court. [2] [7135868] (Note: The Office of the IL Attorney General has been notified of the filing of the appeal.) [21-1109] (FP) [Entered: 01/21/2021 10:23 AM]
January 20, 2021 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee due. Transcript information sheet due by 02/03/2021. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Huguette Nicole Young by 01/27/2021. Fee or IFP forms due on 02/03/2021 for Appellant Huguette Nicole Young [1] [7135844] [21-1109] (FP) [Entered: 01/21/2021 10:02 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Huguette Young v. Kwame Raoul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KWAME RAOUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: HUGUETTE NICOLE YOUNG
Represented By: Huguette Nicole Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?