Steven Zirko v. Karen Rabideau, et al
Defendant / Appellee: XAVIER TAYLOR, LOUIS SAPIA, KAREN RABIDEAU, RANDY PFISTER and JOEL SHAW
Plaintiff / Appellant: STEVEN ZIRKO
Case Number: 21-1389
Filed: March 4, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
November 16, 2022 Steven Zirko v. Karen Rabideau

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing is SUSPENDED pending further court order. [8] RJS [7151829] [21-1389] (AG) [Entered: 04/05/2021 11:31 AM]
March 29, 2021 Filing 7 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Steven Zirko. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [7] [7150324] [21-1389] (Richards, Stephen) [Entered: 03/29/2021 09:13 AM]
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Appellant Steven Zirko is directed to file the overdue Docketing Statement within 14 days from the date of this Rule to Show Cause. Docketing statement response due for Appellant Steven Zirko by 04/02/2021. [6] [7148433] [21-1389] (AD) [Entered: 03/19/2021 09:55 AM]
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 05/05/2021 for Steven Zirko. Appellees' brief due on or before 06/07/2021 for Randy Pfister, Karen Rabideau, Louis Sapia, Joel Shaw and Xavier Taylor. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 06/28/2021 for Appellant Steven Zirko. RJS [7147040] [21-1389] (MM) [Entered: 03/12/2021 02:14 PM]
March 12, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Monday, April 5, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. RJS [4] [7147035] [21-1389] (MM) [Entered: 03/12/2021 02:10 PM]
March 9, 2021 Filing 3 Attorney Nadine J. Wichern for Xavier Taylor, Joel Shaw, Louis Sapia, Karen Rabideau and Randy Pfister in 21-1389 terminated and added Attorney(s) Chaya M. Citrin for party(s) Appellee Randy Pfister Appellee Xavier Taylor Appellee Karen Rabideau Appellee Joel Shaw Appellee Louis Sapia, in case 21-1389 per appearance form. Appearance form filed by Attorney Chaya M Citrin for Appellees Randy Pfister, Karen Rabideau, Louis Sapia, Joel Shaw and Xavier Taylor. [3] [7146130] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [21-1389]--[Edited 03/09/2021 by AD to reflect the termination and addition of counsel.] (Citrin, Chaya) [Entered: 03/09/2021 11:02 AM]
March 4, 2021 Filing 2 THIS CAUSE CONSISTS OF MORE THAN 5 PARTIES FOR EITHER SIDE. The following are those parties to this cause as reflected on the District Court docket, yet are not reflected on the Appellate docket/caption for administrative purposes: APPELLEES: Unknown I.A. Officers, I.D.O.C. [2] [7145355] [21-1389] (CG) [Entered: 03/04/2021 12:34 PM]
March 4, 2021 Filing 1 State prisoner's civil rights case docketed. Fee Paid. Appellant's brief due on or before 04/13/2021 for Steven Zirko. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Steven Zirko by 03/10/2021. Transcript information sheet due by 03/18/2021. [1] [7145347] [21-1389] (CG) [Entered: 03/04/2021 12:21 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Steven Zirko v. Karen Rabideau, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: XAVIER TAYLOR
Represented By: Nadine J. Wichern
Represented By: Chaya M. Citrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LOUIS SAPIA
Represented By: Nadine J. Wichern
Represented By: Chaya M. Citrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KAREN RABIDEAU
Represented By: Nadine J. Wichern
Represented By: Chaya M. Citrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RANDY PFISTER
Represented By: Nadine J. Wichern
Represented By: Chaya M. Citrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOEL SHAW
Represented By: Nadine J. Wichern
Represented By: Chaya M. Citrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: STEVEN ZIRKO
Represented By: Stephen L. Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?