Antrell Teen v. Deborah Hale
Defendant / Appellee: DEBORAH HALE, Nurse at the St. Clair County Jail
Plaintiff / Appellant: ANTRELL A. TEEN
Case Number: 21-1667
Filed: April 16, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2021 Filing 4 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Antrell A. Teen. [4] [7160825] [21-1667] (AD) [Entered: 05/17/2021 04:01 PM]
May 4, 2021 Filing 3 Filed District Court order DENYING Appellant Antrell A. Teen leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Date IFP denied: 05/03/2021. [3] [7157767] PLRA Fee/Motion/Memorandum due on 06/03/2021 [21-1667] (CM) [Entered: 05/04/2021 09:04 AM]
April 20, 2021 Filing 2 Appearance form filed by Attorney Dennis S. Harms and Kevin K. Peek for Appellee Deborah Hale. [2] [7155114] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [21-1667] [Edited 04/20/2021 by AG to reflect addition of counsel] (Peek, Kevin) [Entered: 04/20/2021 12:26 PM]
April 16, 2021 Filing 1 State prisoner's civil rights case docketed. IT IS ORDERED that this appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Proceedings are SUSPENDED pending notification by the district court that any necessary fee has been assessed, and if assessed, paid. PLRA IFP pending in the District Court. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Antrell A. Teen by 04/23/2021. Transcript information sheet due by 04/30/2021. [1] [7154559] [21-1667] (MM) [Entered: 04/16/2021 02:12 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Antrell Teen v. Deborah Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEBORAH HALE, Nurse at the St. Clair County Jail
Represented By: Kevin Peek
Represented By: Dennis S. Harms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANTRELL A. TEEN
Represented By: Antrell A. Teen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?