Marcus Snell v. Ron Neal
Respondent / Appellee: RON NEAL, Warden
Petitioner / Appellant: MARCUS I. SNELL
Case Number: 21-2153
Filed: June 22, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This cause is DISMISSED pursuant to Circuit Rule 3(c). Mandate issued, no record to be returned. [7] [7177725] [21-2153] (AD) [Entered: 08/06/2021 02:33 PM]
August 6, 2021 FOR COURT USE ONLY: Certified copy of 08/06/2021 Final Order with Mandate sent to the District Court Clerk. [7177735-2] [7177735] [21-2153] (AD) [Entered: 08/06/2021 02:52 PM]
August 3, 2021 Filing 6 Issued Circuit Rule 3(b) 14 day notice to file a motion for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis or pay the docketing fee in the District Court. Fee or IFP forms due on 08/17/2021 for Appellant Marcus I. Snell. [6] [7176840] [21-2153] (AG) [Entered: 08/03/2021 12:13 PM]
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re: Motion for enlargement of time, filed on 7/12/2021. The motion is GRANTED to the extent that the appellant shall either pay the $505.00 filing fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis with this court by July 20, 2021. [ # 4 ] CMD [5] [7172386] [21-2153] (FP) [Entered: 07/13/2021 08:58 AM]
July 12, 2021 Filing 4 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Marcus I. Snell to extend time to file motion for permission to appeal in forma pauperis and other necessary documents. [4] [7172321] [21-2153] (CAH) [Entered: 07/12/2021 03:35 PM]
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Appellant Marcus I. Snell is directed to file the overdue Docketing Statement within 14 days from the date of this Rule to Show Cause. Docketing statement response due for Appellant Marcus I. Snell by 07/22/2021. Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7020 2450 0002 1929 9514. [3] [7171682] [21-2153] (AD) [Entered: 07/08/2021 09:29 AM]
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: In light of Walker v. O'Brien, 216 F.3d 626 (7th Cir. 2000), this case may proceed without a certificate of appealability. DW [2] [7168643] [21-2153] (MM) [Entered: 06/23/2021 04:21 PM]
June 22, 2021 Filing 1 State prisoner's habeas corpus case docketed. IFP on appeal denied on 06/01/2021. Fee due. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Marcus I. Snell by 06/28/2021. Fee or IFP forms due on 07/06/2021 for Appellant Marcus I. Snell. Transcript information sheet due by 07/06/2021. [1] [7168624] [21-2153] (MM) [Entered: 06/23/2021 04:05 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Marcus Snell v. Ron Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: RON NEAL, Warden
Represented By: Marjorie Lawyer-Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: MARCUS I. SNELL
Represented By: Marcus I. Snell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?