Lazaro Zapata v. Leonta Jackson
Petitioner / Appellant: LAZARO E. ZAPATA
Respondent / Appellee: LEONTA JACKSON, Warden
Case Number: 21-2243
Filed: July 6, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file motion for certificate of appealability to the extent that any separate request for a certificate of appealability is due by September 27, 2021. In the event that the appellant does not file a motion by that date, his notice of appeal previously docketed in this court will be deemed to constitute an application for a certificate of appealability. See Fed. R. App. P. 22(b)(2). [ # 8 ]. CMD [9] [7181874] [21-2243] (ER) [Entered: 08/27/2021 09:15 AM]
August 26, 2021 Filing 8 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Lazaro E. Zapata to extend time to file motion for certificate of appealability. [8] [7181818] [21-2243] (CAH) [Entered: 08/26/2021 03:58 PM]
August 16, 2021 Filing 7 Received partial filing fee from the District Court of $350.00 from Appellant Lazaro E. Zapata on 08/16/2021. [7] [7179296] [21-2243] (CM) [Entered: 08/16/2021 02:42 PM]
August 10, 2021 Filing 6 Docketing Statement filed by. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [6] [7178325] [21-2243] (CAH) [Entered: 08/10/2021 03:55 PM]
August 9, 2021 Filing 5 Issued Circuit Rule 3(b) 14 day notice to file a motion for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis or pay the docketing fee in the District Court. Fee or IFP forms due on 08/23/2021 for Appellant Lazaro E. Zapata [5] [7177894] [21-2243] (AG) [Entered: 08/09/2021 11:29 AM]
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Appellant Lazaro E. Zapata is directed to file the overdue Docketing Statement within 14 days from the date of this Rule to Show Cause. Docketing statement response due for Appellant Lazaro E. Zapata by 08/05/2021. Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7019 0700 0000 6008 2787. [4] [7174461] [21-2243] (AD) [Entered: 07/22/2021 10:09 AM]
July 14, 2021 Filing 3 Filed District Court order GRANTING Appellant Lazaro E. Zapata leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis, in part, and denied, in part. The Court concludes that Petitioner is financially able to pay $350.00 towards the appellate fees. The remaining $155.00 in fees is waived based on Petitioners IFP status. [3] [7172693] [21-2243] (AP) [Entered: 07/14/2021 08:35 AM]
July 6, 2021 Filing 2 This is notification that no appellee(s) or counsel for the appellee(s) were served in the District Court. [2] [7171579] (Note: The Office of the IL Attorney General has been notified of the filing of the appeal.) [21-2243] (ZNS) [Entered: 07/07/2021 03:18 PM]
July 6, 2021 Filing 1 State prisoner's habeas corpus case docketed. Certificate of Appealability denied 05/27/2021. IFP pending in the District Court. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Lazaro E. Zapata by 07/13/2021. Transcript information sheet due by 07/20/2021. [1] [7171563] [21-2243] (ZNS) [Entered: 07/07/2021 03:06 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Lazaro Zapata v. Leonta Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: LAZARO E. ZAPATA
Represented By: Lazaro E. Zapata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: LEONTA JACKSON, Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?