Antonio McCaster v. Ron Neal
Petitioner / Appellant: ANTONIO D. MCCASTER
Respondent / Appellee: RON NEAL
Case Number: 21-2817
Filed: October 5, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2021 Filing 20 Jurisdictional memorandum filed by Appellee Ron Neal. [20] [7199826] [21-2817] (Drum, Jesse) [Entered: 11/17/2021 02:58 PM]
November 12, 2021 Filing 19 Appearance form filed by Attorney Jesse R. Drum for Appellee Ron Neal. [19] [7198832] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [21-2817] [Edited 11/12/2021 by AG to reflect addition of counsel] (Drum, Jesse) [Entered: 11/12/2021 01:58 PM]
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: On consideration of the paper captioned Jurisdictional Statement filed by petitioner-appellant Antonio D. McCaster on November 9, 2021, appellee shall file, on or before November 17, 2021, a response to petitioner-appellant's filing, addressing the jurisdictional issue raised in the court's order of October 7, 2021. DW [18] [7198460] [21-2817] (AD) [Entered: 11/10/2021 02:04 PM]
November 9, 2021 Filing 17 Jurisdictional memorandum filed by Appellant Antonio D. McCaster per order. [17] [7198160] [21-2817] (HTP) [Entered: 11/09/2021 02:43 PM]
November 9, 2021 Filing 16 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Antonio D. McCaster per order. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [16] [7198158] [21-2817] (HTP) [Entered: 11/09/2021 02:40 PM]
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re: 1. Verified notice in request for permission to leave to submit a belated circuit rule 3(c) docketing statement. 2. Verified notice in request for permission to leave to submit a belated jurisdictional statement. The motions are GRANTED. The clerk shall file INSTANTER the appellants tendered docketing statement and jurisdictional memorandum. [ # 14 ] [ # 13 ]. CMD [15] [7198147] [21-2817] (HTP) [Entered: 11/09/2021 02:23 PM]
November 8, 2021 Filing 14 Prose motion filed by Appellant Antonio D. McCaster to file belated docketing statement. 1 copy docketing statement tendered. [14] [7197809] [21-2817] (MAN) [Entered: 11/08/2021 03:08 PM]
November 8, 2021 Filing 13 Prose motion filed by Appellant Antonio D. McCaster to submit belated jurisdictional statement. 1 copy jurisdictional statement tendered. [13] [7197808] [21-2817] (MAN) [Entered: 11/08/2021 03:07 PM]
November 4, 2021 Filing 12 Filed prisoner trust fund account statement by Appellant Antonio D. McCaster forwarded from the district court with district court's 11/04/2021 order denying the motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. [12] [7197179] [21-2817] (MM) [Entered: 11/04/2021 04:26 PM]
November 4, 2021 Filing 11 Filed District Court order DENYING leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. (See order for further details). Date IFP denied: 11/04/2021. Issued Circuit Rule 3(b) 30 day notice for failure to pay the docketing fee. Fee or IFP forms due on 12/06/2021 for Appellant Antonio D. McCaster. [7197176] [11] [7197176] [21-2817] (MM) [Entered: 11/04/2021 04:12 PM]
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order issued TRANSFERRING the motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis on appeal to the clerk of the District Court for ruling in the first instance. JR [10] [7195423] [21-2817] (CG) [Entered: 10/28/2021 03:55 PM]
October 28, 2021 Filing 9 Prose motion filed by Appellant Antonio D. McCaster to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. [9] [7195341] [21-2817] (CAH) [Entered: 10/28/2021 02:07 PM]
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The court, on its own motion, orders petitioner-appellant Antonio D. McCaster to show cause for his failure to respond to the court's order of 10/07/2021. Petitioner - Appellant McCaster shall file his response on or before 11/10/2021. Appellant is advised that failure to respond may result in the dismissal of this appeal. The clerk is directed to attach a copy of the court's order of 10/07/2021, to appellant's copy of this order. Receipt Number: 7018 0360 0000 5171 6254. DW[8] [7195087] [21-2817] (MM) [Entered: 10/27/2021 04:24 PM]
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Appellant Antonio D. McCaster is directed to file the overdue Docketing Statement within 14 days from the date of this Rule to Show Cause. Docketing statement response due for Appellant Antonio D. McCaster by 11/04/2021. Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7019 0700 0000 6008 4934. [7] [7193507] [21-2817] (AD) [Entered: 10/21/2021 09:59 AM]
October 15, 2021 Filing 6 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Antonio D. McCaster for certificate of appealability, per order. [6] [7192143] [21-2817] (AP) [Entered: 10/15/2021 10:23 AM]
October 15, 2021 Filing 5 INSTANTER ORDER re: Motion for leave to file motion for certificate of appealability. IT IS ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. The clerk shall file instanter the tendered request for a certificate of appealability. [ # 2 ]. CMD [5] [7192139] [21-2817] (AP) [Entered: 10/15/2021 10:19 AM]
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Appellant Antonio D. McCaster shall file a brief memorandum stating why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Briefing is SUSPENDED pending further court order. (See order for further details) [7190719] DW Jurisdictional memorandum due for Appellant Antonio D. McCaster by 10/20/2021. [4] [7190719] [21-2817] (FP) [Entered: 10/07/2021 03:53 PM]
October 5, 2021 Filing 3 Filed letter from Appellant Antonio D. McCaster regarding the supporting documents requesting a motion for a certificate of appealability. [3] [7190357] [21-2817] (FP) [Entered: 10/06/2021 12:47 PM]
October 5, 2021 Filing 2 Prose motion filed by Party Antonio D. McCaster to leave to file motion for certificate of appelability. 1 copy motion for certificate of appealability tendered. [2] [7190355] [21-2817] (FP) [Entered: 10/06/2021 12:42 PM]
October 5, 2021 Filing 1 State prisoner's habeas corpus case docketed. Certificate of Appealability denied 08/18/2021. Fee due. Transcript information sheet due by 10/19/2021. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Antonio D. McCaster by 10/12/2021. Fee or IFP forms due on 10/19/2021 for Appellant Antonio D. McCaster. [1] [7190350] [21-2817] (FP) [Entered: 10/06/2021 12:16 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Antonio McCaster v. Ron Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: ANTONIO D. MCCASTER
Represented By: Antonio D. McCaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: RON NEAL
Represented By: Stephen R. Creason
Represented By: Jesse Drum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?