Daryl Henderson, Jr. v. Ron Neal
Petitioner / Appellant: DARYL K. HENDERSON, JR.
Respondent / Appellee: RON NEAL
Case Number: 21-2821
Filed: October 6, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2021 Filing 11 Mandate issued. No record to be returned. [11] [7201633] [21-2821] (LJ) [Entered: 11/29/2021 09:58 AM]
November 29, 2021 FOR COURT USE ONLY: Certified copy of 11/04/2021 Final Order with Mandate sent to the Agency Representative. [7201640-2] [7201640] [21-2821] (LJ) [Entered: 11/29/2021 10:02 AM]
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re: Affidavit Accompanying Motion for Permission to Appeal In Forma Pauperis. In light of the courts final order dated November 4, 2021, the appellants motion will be filed without further court action. CMD [10] [7199035] [21-2821] (ER) [Entered: 11/15/2021 09:36 AM]
November 12, 2021 Filing 9 Prose motion filed by Appellant Daryl K. Henderson, Jr. to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. [9] [7198883] [21-2821] (LCP) [Entered: 11/12/2021 02:55 PM]
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: This appeal is DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction. (See order for details.) Michael S. Kanne, Circuit Judge; Michael B. Brennan, Circuit Judge and Thomas L. Kirsch II, Circuit Judge. [8] [7197105] [21-2821] (CG) [Entered: 11/04/2021 02:06 PM]
October 28, 2021 Filing 7 Jurisdictional memorandum filed by Appellee Ron Neal. [7] [7195180] [21-2821] (Drum, Jesse) [Entered: 10/28/2021 09:55 AM]
October 27, 2021 Filing 6 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Jesse R. Drum for Appellee Ron Neal. [6] [7194780] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [21-2821] [6] [7194780] [21-2821]--[Edited 10/27/2021 by HTP to reflect termination and addition of counsel.] (Drum, Jesse) [Entered: 10/27/2021 08:55 AM]
October 25, 2021 Filing 5 Filed District Court order DENYING Appellant Daryl K. Henderson, Jr. leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis and DENYING the motion for a certificate of appealability. (See order for further details). Date IFP denied: 10/13/2021. Issued Circuit Rule 3(b) 30 day notice for failure to pay the docketing fee. Fee or IFP forms due on 11/24/2021 for Appellant Daryl K. Henderson Jr. [7194060] [5] [7194060] [21-2821] (MM) [Entered: 10/25/2021 08:05 AM]
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: On consideration of the Jurisdictional Memorandum filed by appellant on October 21, 2021, appellee shall file, on or before October 29, 2021, a response to appellants filing, addressing the jurisdictional issue raised in the courts order of October 7, 2021. DW [4] [7193948] [21-2821] (AD) [Entered: 10/22/2021 02:16 PM]
October 21, 2021 Filing 3 Jurisdictional memorandum filed by Appellant Daryl K. Henderson, Jr.. [3] [7193699] [21-2821] (CAH) [Entered: 10/21/2021 03:01 PM]
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: Appellant Daryl K. Henderson, Jr. shall file a brief memorandum stating why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Briefing is SUSPENDED pending further court order. (See order for further details) [7190655] DW Jurisdictional memorandum due for Appellant Daryl K. Henderson Jr. by 10/20/2021 [2] [7190655] [21-2821] (ER) [Entered: 10/07/2021 02:13 PM]
October 6, 2021 Filing 1 State prisoner's habeas corpus case docketed. Certificate of Appealability denied 08/18/2021. IFP pending in the District Court. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 10/20/2021. [1] [7190382] [21-2821] (CG) [Entered: 10/06/2021 02:15 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Daryl Henderson, Jr. v. Ron Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: DARYL K. HENDERSON, JR.
Represented By: Daryl K. Henderson Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: RON NEAL
Represented By: Caryn Nieman Szyper
Represented By: Jesse Drum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?