Jerry Young v. Ron Neal
Petitioner / Appellant: JERRY WAYNE YOUNG
Respondent / Appellee: RON NEAL
Case Number: 21-3307
Filed: December 14, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2022 Filing 5 Filed notice from the District Court that the appeal docketing fee was received. [5] [7212686] [21-3307] (CAG) [Entered: 01/21/2022 03:50 PM]
January 10, 2022 Filing 4 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Jerry Wayne Young. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [4] [7210072] [21-3307] (MAN) [Entered: 01/10/2022 03:22 PM]
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Appellant Jerry Wayne Young is directed to file the overdue Docketing Statement within 14 days from the date of this Rule to Show Cause. Docketing statement response due for Appellant Jerry Wayne Young by 01/12/2022. Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7020 2450 0002 1930 2733. [3] [7207811] [21-3307] (AD) [Entered: 12/29/2021 09:10 AM]
December 28, 2021 Filing 2 Filed District Court order DENYING Appellant Jerry Wayne Young leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Date IFP denied: 12/28/2021. Issued Circuit Rule 3(b) 30 day notice for failure to pay the docketing fee. Fee or IFP forms due on 01/27/2022 for Appellant Jerry Wayne Young. [7207620] [2] [7207620] [21-3307] (CG) [Entered: 12/28/2021 11:49 AM]
December 14, 2021 Filing 1 State prisoner's habeas corpus case docketed. Certificate of Appealability denied 11/08/2021. IFP pending in the District Court. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Jerry Wayne Young by 12/16/2021. Transcript information sheet due by 12/28/2021.. [1] [7205136] [21-3307] (AP) [Entered: 12/14/2021 12:18 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jerry Young v. Ron Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: JERRY WAYNE YOUNG
Represented By: Jerry Wayne Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: RON NEAL
Represented By: Angela N. Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?