Ryan Bechard v. USA, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: RYAN THOMAS BECHARD
Defendant / Appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE UNITED STATES, SECRETARY OF THE TREASURY, COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY OF THE UNITED STATES and FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION
Case Number: 22-1029
Filed: January 7, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Marine Contract Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: This cause is DISMISSED pursuant to Circuit Rule 3(b). Mandate issued, no record to be returned.[22][7220349] [22-1029] (AG) [Entered: 03/02/2022 08:22 AM]
March 2, 2022 FOR COURT USE ONLY: Certified copy of 03/02/2022 Final Order with Mandate sent to the District Court Clerk. [7220386-2] [7220386] [22-1029] (AG) [Entered: 03/02/2022 09:46 AM]
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER re: 1) Emergency motion to transfer case. 2) Motion to file electronically via email. 3) Emergency motion for summary judgment. IT IS ORDERED that the motion to transfer is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion to submit documents to the court using the clerks office email address, CA07_pro_se_filings@ca7.uscourts.gov, is GRANTED. Any abuse of the email-filing privilege will lead to its termination. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that the motion for summary judgment is DENIED. The appellant should raise any arguments addressing the merits of his appeal in his opening brief, if this case proceeds to briefing. [ # 11 ] MEK [21] [7217361] [22-1029] (AG) [Entered: 02/15/2022 01:29 PM]
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re: Emergency motion for reconsideration of orders en banc, which the court construes as a motion for reconsideration of the courts orders entered on February 8, 2022. The motion for reconsideration is DENIED. [ # 16 ] MEK [20] [7216987] [22-1029]--[Edited 02/14/2022 by CMD to correct text.] (HTP) [Entered: 02/14/2022 09:14 AM]
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER issued GRANTING Motion of the United States Attorney for an Order of Non-involvement on Appeal Due to a Lack of Service in the Trial Court. [ # 18 ] Counsel for the appellees have notified the court that the they were not served with process in the District Court and will not be proceeding in this appeal. Accordingly, the clerk shall remove the respondents from the docket in this appeal. This appeal will be submitted for decision upon the filing of a brief by the appellant. CMD [19] [7216304] [22-1029] (AD) [Entered: 02/09/2022 02:14 PM]
February 9, 2022 Filing 18 Motion filed by Appellees Attorney General of the United States, USA, Comptroller of the Currency of the United States, FDIC and Secretary of the Treasury in 22-1029 of the United States Attorney for an Order of Non-Involvement on Appeal due to a lack of of service in the trial court. [18] [7216256] [22-1029] (Herje, Leslie) [Entered: 02/09/2022 12:13 PM]
February 9, 2022 Filing 17 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Ryan Thomas Bechard to file electronically via email. [17] [7216229] [22-1029] (CAH) [Entered: 02/09/2022 11:38 AM]
February 9, 2022 Filing 16 Emergency pro se motion filed by Appellant Ryan Thomas Bechard for reconsideration of orders en banc. [16] [7216228] [22-1029] (CAH) [Entered: 02/09/2022 11:36 AM]
February 9, 2022 Filing 15 Emergency pro se motion filed by Appellant Ryan Thomas Bechard to transfer case to USCIT in ex parte. [15] [7216226] [22-1029] (CAH) [Entered: 02/09/2022 11:35 AM]
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re: 1) Statement in re Filing Fee, Costs and Expenses. [ # 8 ] 2) Response to Order of Doc #5. [ # 10 ] The motions are DENIED. Appellant is reminded that failure to pay the docketing fee or to file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis could lead to dismissal of this appeal. The clerk of this court shall send appellant a copy of this courts in forma pauperis forms. MEK [14] [7215915] [22-1029] (AD) [Entered: 02/08/2022 09:29 AM]
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re: 1) Motion for Order to Direct Arbitration in Ex Parte. [ # 6 ] 2) Motion for Suspension of FRAP and Circuit Rules in Ex Parte. [ # 7 ] The motions are DENIED. MEK [13] [7215900] [22-1029] (AD) [Entered: 02/08/2022 09:15 AM]
February 7, 2022 Filing 12 Filed Certificate of Service to emergency pro se motion filed on 02/07/2022 by Appellant Ryan Thomas Bechard. [12] [7215783] [22-1029] (CAH) [Entered: 02/07/2022 03:44 PM]
February 7, 2022 Filing 11 Emergency prose motion filed by Appellant Ryan Thomas Bechard for summary judgment in ex parte. [11] [7215748] [22-1029] (CAH) [Entered: 02/07/2022 02:48 PM]
February 4, 2022 Filing 10 Filed Response by Appellant Ryan Thomas Bechard to order of doc #5. [10][7215435] [22-1029] (CAG) [Entered: 02/04/2022 01:18 PM]
February 3, 2022 Filing 9 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Ryan Thomas Bechard. Prior or Related proceedings: Yes. 22-1030 [9] [7215336] [22-1029] (CAG) [Entered: 02/04/2022 09:16 AM]
February 3, 2022 Filing 8 Filed Appellant Ryan Thomas Bechard in 22-1030, 22-1029 statement to filing fee, costs, and expenses. [8] [7215335] [22-1030, 22-1029] (CAG) [Entered: 02/04/2022 09:15 AM]
February 3, 2022 Filing 7 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Ryan Thomas Bechard for suspension of frap and circuit rules in ex parte. [7] [7215329] [22-1029] (CAG) [Entered: 02/04/2022 09:06 AM]
February 3, 2022 Filing 6 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Ryan Thomas Bechard for order to direct arbitration in ex parte. [6] [7215327] [22-1029] (CAG) [Entered: 02/04/2022 09:05 AM]
February 1, 2022 Filing 5 Issued Circuit Rule 3(b) 14 day notice to file a motion for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis or pay the docketing fee in the District Court. Fee or IFP forms due on 02/15/2022 for Appellant Ryan Thomas Bechard. [5] [7214608] [22-1029] (AG) [Entered: 02/01/2022 10:32 AM]
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Appellant Ryan Thomas Bechard is directed to file the overdue Docketing Statement within 14 days from the date of this Rule to Show Cause. Docketing statement response due for Appellant Ryan Thomas Bechard by 02/07/2022. [4] [7212880] [22-1029] (AD) [Entered: 01/24/2022 12:46 PM]
January 7, 2022 Filing 3 No attorney(s) added for Appellees Attorney General of the United States, Comptroller of the Currency of the United States, FDIC and Secretary of the Treasury, per District Court docket and information sheet. [3] [7209869] [22-1029] (CG) [Entered: 01/10/2022 10:51 AM]
January 7, 2022 Filing 2 THIS CAUSE CONSISTS OF MORE THAN 5 PARTIES FOR EITHER SIDE. The following are those parties to this cause as reflected on the District Court docket, yet are not reflected on the Appellate docket/caption for administrative purposes: APPELLEES: Kathleen Lynn Gehrke, Serena Anne Bechard, Lucas Gordon Bechard, Leroy Gordon Bechard, Arthur Raymond Bechard, Lorraine Arlene Bechard, Lester Carl Scleusner. [2] [7209866] [22-1029] (CG) [Entered: 01/10/2022 10:48 AM]
January 7, 2022 Filing 1 U.S. civil case docketed. Fee due. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Ryan T Bechard by 01/14/2022. Transcript information sheet due by 01/21/2022. Fee or IFP forms due on 01/21/2022 for Appellant Ryan T Bechard [1] [7209851] [22-1029] (CG) [Entered: 01/10/2022 10:33 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Ryan Bechard v. USA, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RYAN THOMAS BECHARD
Represented By: Ryan Thomas Bechard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Leslie K. Herje
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE UNITED STATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SECRETARY OF THE TREASURY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY OF THE UNITED STATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?