Phillip Carroll v. BMW of North America, Incorporated
Plaintiff / Appellant: PHILLIP CARROLL
Defendant / Appellee: BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, INCORPORATED and BAVARIAN MOTOR WORKS
Case Number: 22-1044
Filed: January 11, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Contract Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 04/18/2022 for Phillip Carroll. Appellee's brief due on or before 05/20/2022 for BMW of North America, Incorporated. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 06/10/2022 for Appellant Phillip Carroll. JNS [7221955] [22-1044] (HTP) [Entered: 03/09/2022 12:38 PM]
February 17, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE: Circuit Rule 46(a) requires lead counsel be admitted to practice within 30 days of the date the appeal/petition was docketed. The rule also requires any attorney wishing to present oral argument to be admitted. Our records indicate as of this date Attorney Vlad Hirnyk for Appellant Phillip Carroll has/have not been admitted to practice in this court. Within 21 days, please file your application for admission by going to: http://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/forms/forms7.htm and choosing the link, "Application for Admission to Practice in the Seventh Circuit". [5] [7217891] [22-1044] (LJ) [Entered: 02/17/2022 10:17 AM]
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 03/02/2022 for Phillip Carroll. Appellee's brief due on or before 04/01/2022 for BMW of North America, Incorporated and Bavarian Motor Works. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 04/22/2022 for Appellant Phillip Carroll. JNS [7212039] [22-1044] (AD) [Entered: 01/19/2022 02:49 PM]
January 19, 2022 Filing 3 Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Wednesday, February 2, 2022 at 1:30 p.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JNS [3] [7212036] [22-1044] (AD) [Entered: 01/19/2022 02:47 PM]
January 19, 2022 Filing 2 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Sergei Lemberg for Appellant Phillip Carroll. [2] [7212029] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1044]--[Edited 01/19/2022 by MM to reflect addition of counsel.] (Lemberg, Sergei) [Entered: 01/19/2022 02:38 PM]
January 11, 2022 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 01/25/2022. Appellant's brief due on or before 02/22/2022 for Phillip Carroll [1] [7210467] [22-1044] (AP) [Entered: 01/12/2022 08:43 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Phillip Carroll v. BMW of North America, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PHILLIP CARROLL
Represented By: Vlad Hirnyk
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, INCORPORATED
Represented By: Timothy V. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BAVARIAN MOTOR WORKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?