Mark Anderson, et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff / Appellant: MARK ANDERSON, LAVERNE GALLANT and CYNTHIA OLIVER
Defendant / Appellee: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 22-1095
Filed: January 20, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, all proceedings in this appeal are STAYED pending further court order. Counsel for the Appellant and Appellee is directed to make a telephonic or electronic mail status report to the Circuit Mediation Office on 04/01/2022. This requirement may be satisfied by filing a motion under Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) to dismiss the appeal. [7220721] [22-1095] (ER) [Entered: 03/03/2022 12:02 PM]
January 26, 2022 Filing 4 Docketing Statement filed by Appellants Mark Anderson, Laverne Gallant and Cynthia Oliver. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [4] [7213579] [22-1095] (Neiman, David) [Entered: 01/26/2022 06:35 PM]
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellants' brief due on or before 03/10/2022 for Mark Anderson, Laverne Gallant and Cynthia Oliver. Appellee's brief due on or before 04/11/2022 for State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Appellants' reply brief, if any, is due on or before 05/02/2022 for Appellants Mark Anderson, Laverne Gallant and Cynthia Oliver. RJS [7213075] [22-1095] (MM) [Entered: 01/25/2022 08:53 AM]
January 25, 2022 Filing 2 Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Thursday, February 10, 2022 at 9:30 a.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. RJS [2] [7213072] [22-1095] (MM) [Entered: 01/25/2022 08:47 AM]
January 20, 2022 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellants Mark Anderson, Laverne Gallant and Cynthia Oliver by 01/25/2022. Transcript information sheet due by 02/03/2022. Appellant's brief due on or before 03/01/2022 for Mark Anderson, Laverne Gallant and Cynthia Oliver. [1] [7212260] [22-1095] (HTP) [Entered: 01/20/2022 12:37 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Mark Anderson, et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARK ANDERSON
Represented By: David A. Neiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LAVERNE GALLANT
Represented By: David A. Neiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CYNTHIA OLIVER
Represented By: David A. Neiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: James P. Gaughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?