Gregory Ruggles v. Donald Ruggles
Plaintiff / Appellee: GREGORY A. RUGGLES
Defendant / Appellant: DONALD RUGGLES
Case Number: 22-1138
Filed: January 28, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Contract Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2022 Filing 13 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Jason J. O'Rourke for Appellant Donald Ruggles. [13] [7223861] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1138] (O'Rourke, Jason) [Entered: 03/18/2022 02:38 PM]
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: On consideration of the Jurisdictional Memorandum filed by appellant on February 10, 2022, the Jurisdictional Memorandum filed by appellee on February 14, 2022, and the Appellants Reply to Appellees Jurisdictional Memorandum filed by appellant on February 21, 2022. IT IS ORDERED that this appeal shall proceed to briefing. Briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 04/04/2022 for Donald Ruggles. Appellee's brief due on or before 05/04/2022 for Gregory A. Ruggles. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 05/25/2022 for Appellant Donald Ruggles. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties fully address in their respective briefs the issue of subject matter jurisdiction raised in appellees Jurisdictional Memorandum. DW [7219147] [22-1138] (AP) [Entered: 02/23/2022 04:27 PM]
February 21, 2022 Filing 11 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Donald Ruggles. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [11] [7218432] [22-1138] (O'Rourke, Jason) [Entered: 02/21/2022 03:37 PM]
February 21, 2022 Filing 10 Filed Response by Appellant Donald Ruggles to APPELLANT'S REPLY TO APPELLEE'S JURISDICTIONAL MEMORANDUM PURSUANT TO ORDER OF FEBRUARY 15, 2022.. [10][7218431] [22-1138]--[Edited 02/22/2022 by ER - to reflect correct document title] (O'Rourke, Jason) [Entered: 02/21/2022 03:36 PM]
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: On consideration of the Jurisdictional Memorandum filed by appellee on February 14, 2022, appellant shall file, on or before February 24, 2022, a reply to appellees filing, addressing appellees claim that subject matter jurisdiction is lacking. [9] [7217351] [22-1138] (FP) [Entered: 02/15/2022 01:11 PM]
February 14, 2022 Filing 8 Jurisdictional memorandum filed by Appellee Gregory A. Ruggles. [8] [7217114] [22-1138] (Churchill, Daniel) [Entered: 02/14/2022 03:24 PM]
February 14, 2022 Filing 7 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Daniel Churchill for Appellee Gregory A. Ruggles. [7] [7217099] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1138] (Churchill, Daniel) [Entered: 02/14/2022 02:58 PM]
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Appellant Donald Ruggles is directed to file the overdue Docketing Statement within 14 days from the date of this Rule to Show Cause. Docketing statement response due for Appellant Donald Ruggles by 02/25/2022. [6] [7216764] [22-1138] (AD) [Entered: 02/11/2022 09:18 AM]
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re: The Jurisdictional Memorandum filed by appellant on February 10, 2022. IT IS ORDERED that appellee file, on or before February 17, 2022, a response to appellant's filing, addressing the jurisdictional issue raised in the court's order of January 31, 2022. DW [5] [7216701] [22-1138] (AG) [Entered: 02/10/2022 04:14 PM]
February 10, 2022 Filing 4 Amended Jurisdictional Statement filed by Appellant Donald Ruggles. [4] [7216678] [22-1138] (O'Rourke, Jason) [Entered: 02/10/2022 03:25 PM]
February 10, 2022 Filing 3 Jurisdictional memorandum filed by Appellant Donald Ruggles. [3] [7216513] [22-1138] (O'Rourke, Jason) [Entered: 02/10/2022 11:21 AM]
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: Appellant Donald Ruggles and Appellee Gregory A. Ruggles shall file a brief memorandum stating why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Briefing is SUSPENDED pending further court order. (See order for further details) [7214332] DW Jurisdictional memorandum due for Appellant Donald Ruggles and Appellee Gregory A. Ruggles by 02/14/2022. [2] [7214332] [22-1138] (FP) [Entered: 01/31/2022 01:11 PM]
January 28, 2022 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Donald Ruggles by 02/03/2022. Transcript information sheet due by 02/11/2022. Appellant's brief due on or before 03/09/2022 for Donald Ruggles [1] [7214068] [22-1138] (AP) [Entered: 01/28/2022 02:26 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Gregory Ruggles v. Donald Ruggles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GREGORY A. RUGGLES
Represented By: Daniel S. Churchill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DONALD RUGGLES
Represented By: Jason J. O'Rourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?