William Richard v. Randy Pfister, et al
Plaintiff / Appellee: WILLIAM H. RICHARD
Defendant / Appellant: RANDY PFISTER, Warden, RICARDO TEJEDA, Assistant Warden and ROB JEFFREYS, in his official capacity as Director of the Illinois Department of Corrections
Case Number: 22-1197
Filed: February 8, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Prisoner-Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, all proceedings in this appeal are STAYED pending further court order. Counsel for the Appellant and Appellee is directed to make a telephonic or electronic mail status report to the Circuit Mediation Office on 04/22/2022. This requirement may be satisfied by filing a motion under Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) to dismiss the appeal. [7221691] [22-1197] (ER) [Entered: 03/08/2022 12:01 PM]
February 22, 2022 Filing 5 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellants Rob Jeffreys, Randy Pfister and Ricardo Tejeda. [5] [7218842] [22-1197] (Chenevert, Kaitlyn) [Entered: 02/22/2022 05:11 PM]
February 14, 2022 Filing 4 Docketing Statement filed by Appellants Rob Jeffreys, Randy Pfister and Ricardo Tejeda. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [4] [7217154] [22-1197] (Chenevert, Kaitlyn) [Entered: 02/14/2022 04:38 PM]
February 14, 2022 Filing 3 Appearance form filed by Attorney Kaitlyn N. Chenevert for Appellants Rob Jeffreys, Randy Pfister and Ricardo Tejeda. [3] [7216993] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [22-1197] [3] [7216993] [22-1197]--[Edited 02/14/2022 by HTP to reflect termination and addition of counsel.] (Chenevert, Kaitlyn) [Entered: 02/14/2022 09:19 AM]
February 11, 2022 Filing 6 Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Wednesday, March 16, 2022 at 9:30 a.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. RJS. [6] [7219720] [22-1197] (FP) [Entered: 02/28/2022 09:16 AM]
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 04/18/2022 for Rob Jeffreys, Randy Pfister and Ricardo Tejeda. Appellee's brief due on or before 05/18/2022 for William H. Richard. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 06/08/2022 for Appellants Rob Jeffreys, Randy Pfister and Ricardo Tejeda. RJS [7216841] [22-1197] (FP) [Entered: 02/11/2022 12:28 PM]
February 8, 2022 Filing 1 State prisoner's civil rights case docketed. Fee Paid. Appellants' brief due on or before 03/21/2022 for Rob Jeffreys, Randy Pfister and Ricardo Tejeda. Docketing Statement due for Appellants Rob Jeffreys, Randy Pfister and Ricardo Tejeda by 02/14/2022. Transcript information sheet due by 02/22/2022. [1] [7216056] [22-1197] (MM) [Entered: 02/08/2022 02:43 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: William Richard v. Randy Pfister, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: WILLIAM H. RICHARD
Represented By: Amanda C. Antholt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: RANDY PFISTER, Warden
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Andonova Mallory
Represented By: Kaitlyn Noel Chenevert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: RICARDO TEJEDA, Assistant Warden
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Andonova Mallory
Represented By: Kaitlyn Noel Chenevert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ROB JEFFREYS, in his official capacity as Director of the Illinois Department of Corrections
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Andonova Mallory
Represented By: Kaitlyn Noel Chenevert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?