Yancheng Shanda Yuanfeng Equity Investment Partner v. Kevin Wan
Plaintiff / Appellee: YANCHENG SHANDA YUANFENG EQUITY INVESTMENT PARTNERSHIP, a Limited Partnership Organized Under the Laws of China
Defendant / Appellant: KEVIN WAN
Case Number: 22-1199
Filed: February 8, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Ovrpmnts & Enforcement of Judgments
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2022 Filing 20 Amended Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Eugene A. Sokoloff for Appellant Kevin Wan. [20] [7228111] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [22-1199]--[Edited 04/07/2022 by MM to reflect termination of counsel.] (Sokoloff, Eugene) [Entered: 04/07/2022 12:55 PM]
April 7, 2022 Filing 19 Amended Jurisdictional Statement filed by Appellant Kevin Wan. [19] [7227961] [22-1199] (Bohl, Lisa) [Entered: 04/07/2022 09:11 AM]
April 6, 2022 Filing 18 Paper copies of appellant brief and appendix filed by Appellant Kevin Wan. [18] [7227682] [22-1199] (LCP) [Entered: 04/06/2022 09:43 AM]
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: The court, on its own initiative, VACATES its order of April 4, 2022, as mistakenly issued. In its place, the court issues the following order: Appellant shall file a paper captioned Amended Jurisdictional Statement no later than April 12, 2022, that provides the omitted information noted above and otherwise complies with all the requirements of Circuit Rule 28(a). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk DISTRIBUTE, along with the briefs in this appeal, copies of this order and appellants Amended Jurisdictional Statement to the assigned merits panel. (See order for details) DW [17] [7227551] [22-1199] (AP) [Entered: 04/05/2022 12:59 PM]
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Appellant shall file a complete statement of jurisdiction that includes the omitted information. The statement is due on or before 04/12/2022. (See order for further details). DW [16] [16] [7227341] [22-1199]--[Edited 04/05/2022 by AP- VACATED per the court's 4/5/22 order] (MM) [Entered: 04/04/2022 04:45 PM]
April 1, 2022 Filing 15 Filed Appendix by Appellant Kevin Wan. [15] [7226982] Paper copies due on 04/08/2022 [22-1199] (LJ) [Entered: 04/01/2022 04:51 PM]
April 1, 2022 Filing 14 Appellant's brief filed by Appellant Kevin Wan. Paper copies due on 04/08/2022. Electronically Transmitted. REMINDER: Hearing notices are mailed shortly before the date of oral argument. Please note that counsel's unavailability for oral argument must be submitted by letter, filed electronically with the Clerk's Office, no later than the filing of the appellant's brief in a criminal case and the filing of an appellee's brief in a civil case. See Cir. R. 34(b)(3). The court's calendar is located at http://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/cal/argcalendar.pdf. Once scheduled, oral argument is rescheduled only in extraordinary circumstances. See Cir. R. 34(b)(4), (e). [14] [7226981] [22-1199] (LJ) [Entered: 04/01/2022 04:50 PM]
April 1, 2022 Filing 13 Submitted Appendix by Lisa W. Bohl for Appellant Kevin Wan. [13] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [7226976] [22-1199] (Bohl, Lisa) [Entered: 04/01/2022 04:31 PM]
April 1, 2022 Filing 12 Submitted appellant brief by Lisa W. Bohl for Appellant Kevin Wan. [12] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [7226974] [22-1199] (Bohl, Lisa) [Entered: 04/01/2022 04:29 PM]
March 30, 2022 Filing 11 Added Attorney(s) Eugene Alexis Sokoloff for party(s) Appellant Kevin Wan, in case 22-1199 per disclosure statement. Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Eugene A. Sokoloff for Appellant Kevin Wan. [11] [7226342] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1199]--[Edited 03/30/2022 by AD to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Sokoloff, Eugene) [Entered: 03/30/2022 03:59 PM]
March 15, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE: Circuit Rule 46(a) requires lead counsel be admitted to practice within 30 days of the date the appeal/petition was docketed. The rule also requires any attorney wishing to present oral argument to be admitted. Our records indicate as of this date Attorney Benjamin C. Levine for Appellee Yancheng Shanda Yuanfeng Equity Investment Partnership has/have not been admitted to practice in this court. Within 21 days, please file your application for admission by going to: http://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/forms/forms7.htm and choosing the link, "Application for Admission to Practice in the Seventh Circuit". [10] [7223050] [22-1199] (LJ) [Entered: 03/15/2022 10:46 AM]
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 04/08/2022 for Kevin Wan. Appellee's brief due on or before 05/10/2022 for Yancheng Shanda Yuanfeng Equity Investment Partnership. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 05/31/2022 for Appellant Kevin Wan JB [7218801] [22-1199] (CG) [Entered: 02/22/2022 04:18 PM]
February 22, 2022 Filing 8 Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted via Zoom, Tuesday March 8, 2022 at 7:00 p.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JB. [8] [7218792] [22-1199] (CG) [Entered: 02/22/2022 04:13 PM]
February 18, 2022 Filing 7 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Kevin Wan. [7] [7218215] [22-1199] (Bohl, Lisa) [Entered: 02/18/2022 11:20 AM]
February 15, 2022 Filing 6 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Kevin Wan. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [6] [7217178] [22-1199] (Bohl, Lisa) [Entered: 02/15/2022 08:09 AM]
February 14, 2022 Filing 5 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Levi Giovanetto for Appellee Yancheng Shanda Yuanfeng Equity Investment Partnership. [5] [7217006] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1199] [5] [7217006] [22-1199]--[Edited 02/14/2022 by HTP to reflect addition of counsel.] (Giovanetto, Levi) [Entered: 02/14/2022 10:10 AM]
February 10, 2022 Filing 4 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Steven F. Molo for Appellant Kevin Wan. [4] [7216729] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1199] (Bohl, Lisa) [Entered: 02/10/2022 05:00 PM]
February 10, 2022 Filing 3 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Robert K. Kry for Appellant Kevin Wan. [3] [7216706] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1199] [Edited 02/10/2022 by CG to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Kry, Robert) [Entered: 02/10/2022 04:22 PM]
February 10, 2022 Filing 2 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Lisa W. Bohl for Appellant Kevin Wan. [2] [7216699] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [22-1199] [2] [7216699] [22-1199]--[Edited 02/10/2022 by HTP to reflect termination and addition of counsel.] (Bohl, Lisa) [Entered: 02/10/2022 04:04 PM]
February 8, 2022 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Kevin Wan by 02/17/2022. Transcript information sheet due by 02/22/2022. Appellant's brief due on or before 03/21/2022 for Kevin Wan. [1] [7216204] [22-1199] (AG) [Entered: 02/09/2022 10:29 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Yancheng Shanda Yuanfeng Equity Investment Partner v. Kevin Wan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: YANCHENG SHANDA YUANFENG EQUITY INVESTMENT PARTNERSHIP, a Limited Partnership Organized Under the Laws of China
Represented By: Benjamin C. Levine
Represented By: Levi Giovanetto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: KEVIN WAN
Represented By: Lisa Wang Bohl
Represented By: Robert K. Kry
Represented By: Eugene Alexis Sokoloff
Represented By: Steven Francis Molo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?