David Buschauer v. Columbia College Chicago
Plaintiff / Appellant: DAVID BUSCHAUER, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Defendant / Appellee: COLUMBIA COLLEGE CHICAGO
Case Number: 22-1216
Filed: February 10, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Contract Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: This appeal is DISMISSED because it is unnecessary. (See order for further detals.) Frank H. Easterbrook, Circuit Judge; Michael B. Brennan, Circuit Judge and Thomas L. Kirsch II, Circuit Judge. [19] [7228174] [22-1216] (FP) [Entered: 04/07/2022 02:35 PM]
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re: Motion for extension of time to file initial brief, filed on 3/29/2022. The motion is GRANTED. Briefing will proceed as follows: [ # 17 ] Appellant's brief due on or before 06/03/2022 for David Buschauer. Appellee's brief due on or before 07/05/2022 for Columbia College Chicago. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 07/26/2022 for Appellant David Buschauer. CMD [18] [7226152] [22-1216, 22-1228] (FP) [Entered: 03/30/2022 10:55 AM]
March 29, 2022 Filing 17 Motion filed by Appellant David Buschauer in 22-1216, 22-1228 to extend time to file appellant brief. [17] [7226034] [22-1216, 22-1228] (Peterson, Matthew) [Entered: 03/29/2022 03:18 PM]
March 15, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE: Circuit Rule 46(a) requires lead counsel be admitted to practice within 30 days of the date the appeal/petition was docketed. The rule also requires any attorney wishing to present oral argument to be admitted. Our records indicate as of this date Attorney Matthew Peterson for Appellant David Buschauer has/have not been admitted to practice in this court. Within 21 days, please file your application for admission by going to: http://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/forms/forms7.htm and choosing the link, "Application for Admission to Practice in the Seventh Circuit". [16] [7223056] [22-1216] (LJ) [Entered: 03/15/2022 10:51 AM]
March 10, 2022 Filing 15 Filed Memorandum by Appellee Columbia College Chicago in 22-1216, 22-1228 to court order of March 3, 2022. [15][7222354] [22-1216, 22-1228] (Khetarpal, Monica) [Entered: 03/10/2022 04:45 PM]
March 7, 2022 Filing 14 Jurisdictional memorandum filed by Appellee Columbia College Chicago in 22-1228, 22-1216. [14] [7221541] [22-1228, 22-1216] (Khetarpal, Monica) [Entered: 03/07/2022 04:33 PM]
March 7, 2022 Filing 13 Filed Memorandum by Appellant David Buschauer in 22-1228, 22-1216 to in response to this Court's February 25, 2022 Order. [13][7221499] [22-1228, 22-1216] (Peterson, Matthew) [Entered: 03/07/2022 03:54 PM]
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: On consideration of the memorandum filed by appellant on March 1, 2022, that the appellee shall file, on or before March 10, 2022, a response to appellant's filing, addressing the issue raised in the court's order of February 15, 2022, as to the necessity of this appeal. Appellee also should address the correctness (or not) of appellants assertion that his second appeal (filed on February 10, 2022) is untimely in light of the entry of judgment on January 11, 2022. DW [12] [7220744] [22-1216] (FP) [Entered: 03/03/2022 12:57 PM]
March 1, 2022 Filing 11 Filed Memorandum by Appellant David Buschauer in 22-1216, 22-1228 to Court's February 15, 2022 Order. [11][7220343] [22-1216, 22-1228] (Peterson, Matthew) [Entered: 03/01/2022 05:28 PM]
February 24, 2022 Filing 10 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant David Buschauer. [10] [7219548] [22-1216] (FP) [Entered: 02/25/2022 12:25 PM]
February 24, 2022 Filing 9 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Matthew T. Peterson for Appellant David Buschauer in 22-1216, 22-1228. [9] [7219389] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1216, 22-1228] (Peterson, Matthew) [Entered: 02/24/2022 03:22 PM]
February 24, 2022 Filing 8 Amended Statement of Jurisdiction filed by Appellant David Buschauer. Prior or Related proceedings: Yes. 22-1228 [8] [7219385] [22-1216] (Peterson, Matthew) [Entered: 02/24/2022 03:17 PM]
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Appellant shall file a complete statement of jurisdiction that includes the omitted information noted in this order. The statement is due on or before February 24, 2022. (See order for further details) DW [7] [7218026] [22-1216] (AG) [Entered: 02/17/2022 02:21 PM]
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 04/04/2022 for David Buschauer. Appellee's brief due on or before 05/04/2022 for Columbia College Chicago. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 05/25/2022 for Appellant David Buschauer. JNS [7217567] [22-1216, 22-1228] (HTP) [Entered: 02/16/2022 09:38 AM]
February 16, 2022 Filing 4 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant David Buschauer. Prior or Related proceedings: Yes. 22-1228 [4] [7217515] [22-1216] (Peterson, Matthew) [Entered: 02/16/2022 08:45 AM]
February 15, 2022 Filing 5 Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Wednesday, March 2, 2022 at 1:30p.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JNS. [5] [7217560] [22-1216, 22-1228] (HTP) [Entered: 02/16/2022 09:34 AM]
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: A preliminary review of the short record indicates that this appeal duplicates a later, amended appeal filed on 02/10/2022, and docketed in this court as Appeal No. 22-1228. Only one appeal is necessary, the other should be dismissed. Harris v. Bellin Memorial Hospital, 13 F.3d 1082, 1083 (7th Cir. 1994). Accordingly, plaintiff-appellant shall file, on or before 03/01/2022, a brief memorandum stating why this appeal should not be dismissed as unnecessary. A motion for voluntary dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) will satisfy this requirement. Briefing shall be SUSPENDED pending further court order. DW [7217384][3] [3] [7217384] [22-1216] (MM) [Entered: 02/15/2022 02:23 PM]
February 15, 2022 Filing 2 Motion filed by Appellant David Buschauer in 22-1228, 22-1216 to correct to assign one case number to the same appeal that was filed twice accidently. [2] [7217339] [22-1228, 22-1216] (Peterson, Matthew) [Entered: 02/15/2022 12:48 PM]
February 10, 2022 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellant David Buschauer by 02/16/2022. Transcript information sheet due by 02/24/2022. Appellant's brief due on or before 03/22/2022 for David Buschauer. [1] [7216672] [22-1216] (PS) [Entered: 02/10/2022 03:17 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: David Buschauer v. Columbia College Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAVID BUSCHAUER, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: Matthew Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COLUMBIA COLLEGE CHICAGO
Represented By: Monica H. Khetarpal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?