Beach Forwarders, Inc. v. Service By Air, Inc.
Plaintiff / Appellee: BEACH FORWARDERS, INC.
Defendant / Appellant: SERVICE BY AIR, INC.
Case Number: 22-1217
Filed: February 10, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Contract Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 05/04/2022 for Service By Air, Inc.. Appellee's brief due on or before 06/10/2022 for Beach Forwarders, Inc.. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 07/01/2022 for Appellant Service By Air, Inc.. JB [7220607] [22-1217] (ER) [Entered: 03/02/2022 04:00 PM]
February 17, 2022 Filing 8 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Marc C. Smith for Appellant Service By Air, Inc.. [8] [7218072] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1217] (Smith, Marc) [Entered: 02/17/2022 03:45 PM]
February 16, 2022 Filing 7 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Marc C. Smith and James E. Breitenbucher for Appellant Service By Air, Inc.. [7] [7217777] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1217] (Smith, Marc) [Entered: 02/16/2022 03:51 PM]
February 16, 2022 Filing 6 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Service By Air, Inc.. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [6] [7217772] [22-1217] (Smith, Marc) [Entered: 02/16/2022 03:44 PM]
February 16, 2022 Filing 5 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Howard L. Lieber for Appellee Beach Forwarders, Inc.. [5] [7217744] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1217] (Lieber, Howard) [Entered: 02/16/2022 03:09 PM]
February 16, 2022 Filing 4 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney James E. Breitenbucher for Appellant Service By Air, Inc.. [4] [7217691] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1217]--[Edited 02/16/2022 by FP to reflect that atty. Breitenbucher is added to the docket.] (Breitenbucher, James) [Entered: 02/16/2022 02:08 PM]
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 04/04/2022 for Service By Air, Inc.. Appellee's brief due on or before 05/04/2022 for Beach Forwarders, Inc.. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 05/25/2022 for Appellant Service By Air, Inc. JB [7217460] [22-1217] (AG) [Entered: 02/15/2022 03:57 PM]
February 15, 2022 Filing 2 Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted via Zoom on Wednesday, March 2, 2022 at 2:00 p.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JB. [2] [7217457] [22-1217] (AG) [Entered: 02/15/2022 03:55 PM]
February 10, 2022 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Service By Air, Inc. by 02/16/2022. Transcript information sheet due by 02/24/2022. Appellant's brief due on or before 03/22/2022 for Service By Air, Inc. [1] [7216817] [22-1217] (PS) [Entered: 02/11/2022 11:05 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Beach Forwarders, Inc. v. Service By Air, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BEACH FORWARDERS, INC.
Represented By: Howard L. Lieber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: SERVICE BY AIR, INC.
Represented By: James E. Breitenbucher
Represented By: Marc C. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?