Joseph Trenkle v. Kubota Corporation, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: JOSEPH TRENKLE
Defendant / Appellee: KUBOTA CORPORATION, KUBOTA MANUFACTURING OF AMERICA CORPORATION and KUBOTA INDUSTRIAL EQUIPMENT CORPORATION
Case Number: 22-1287
Filed: February 23, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury-Product Liability
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re: Stipulated dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). [ # 12 ] This cause is DISMISSED pursuant to F.R.A.P. 42(b). Mandate issued, no record to be returned. [13][7313236] [22-1287] (PS) [Entered: 05/26/2023 10:24 AM]
May 26, 2023 FOR COURT USE ONLY: Certified copy of 05/26/2023 Final Order with Mandate sent to the District Court Clerk. [7313241-2] [7313241] [22-1287] (PS) [Entered: 05/26/2023 10:30 AM]
May 25, 2023 Filing 12 Joint motion filed by Appellant Joseph Trenkle to dismiss case. [12] [7312861] [22-1287] (Janssen, Jay) [Entered: 05/25/2023 11:35 AM]
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, all proceedings in this appeal are STAYED pending further court order. Counsel for the Appellant and Appellee are directed to make a telephonic status report to the Circuit Mediation Office on 06/07/2022. This requirement may be satisfied by filing a motion under Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) to dismiss the appeal. [7227617] [22-1287] (CG) [Entered: 04/05/2022 04:04 PM]
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 05/05/2022 for Joseph Trenkle. Appellees' brief due on or before 06/06/2022 for Kubota Corporation, Kubota Industrial Equipment Corporation and Kubota Manufacturing of America Corporation. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 06/27/2022 for Appellant Joseph Trenkle. JB [7224574] [22-1287] (PS) [Entered: 03/22/2022 02:35 PM]
March 18, 2022 Filing 9 Amended Jurisdictional Statement filed by Appellant Joseph Trenkle. [9] [7223860] [22-1287] (Janssen, Jay) [Entered: 03/18/2022 02:38 PM]
March 16, 2022 Filing 8 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Jordan D. Shea for Appellee Kubota Corporation. for Kubota Tractor Corporation. [8] [7223439] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1287] (Shea, Jordan) [Entered: 03/16/2022 04:17 PM]
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: On consideration of the Response to Order of March 4, 2022 to Show Cause by Attorney Jay H. Janssen filed on March 11, 2022, attorney Janssen shall file his response to the court's February 23, 2022 order no later than March 22, 2022. DW [7] [7222605] [22-1287] (CG) [Entered: 03/11/2022 04:34 PM]
March 11, 2022 Filing 6 Filed Showcause Response by Appellant Joseph Trenkle Attorney Jay H. Janssen to Court order of 03/04/22. [6][7222493] [22-1287] (Janssen, Jay) [Entered: 03/11/2022 12:47 PM]
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The court, on its own motion, orders attorney Jay H. Janssen to show cause for his failure to respond to the court's order of February 23, 2022. Attorney Jay H. Jannsen shall file his response on or before March 11, 2022. Counsel is advised that failure to respond may result in monetary or disciplinary sanctions. DW [5] [7221199] [22-1287] (PS) [Entered: 03/04/2022 04:18 PM]
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 04/11/2022 for Joseph Trenkle. Appellee's brief due on or before 05/11/2022 for Kubota Corporation, Kubota Industrial Equipment Corporation and Kubota Manufacturing of America Corporation. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 06/01/2022 for Appellant Joseph Trenkle. JB [7219767] [22-1287] (FP) [Entered: 02/28/2022 10:19 AM]
February 25, 2022 Filing 3 Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Friday, March 11, 2022 at 2: p.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JB. [3] [7219757] [22-1287] (FP) [Entered: 02/28/2022 10:05 AM]
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: Appellant shall file a complete statement of jurisdiction that includes the omitted information. The statement is due on or before March 2, 2022. ( See order for details) DW [2] [7219131] [22-1287] (AP) [Entered: 02/23/2022 04:09 PM]
February 23, 2022 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 03/09/2022. Appellant's brief due on or before 04/04/2022 for Joseph Trenkle [1] [7218984] [22-1287] (AG) [Entered: 02/23/2022 12:09 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Joseph Trenkle v. Kubota Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOSEPH TRENKLE
Represented By: Jay H. Janssen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KUBOTA CORPORATION
Represented By: Jordan D. Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KUBOTA MANUFACTURING OF AMERICA CORPORATION
Represented By: Jordan D. Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KUBOTA INDUSTRIAL EQUIPMENT CORPORATION
Represented By: Jordan D. Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?