Mary Corner v. Marty Walsh
Plaintiff / Appellant: MARY L. CORNER
Defendant / Appellee: MARTY WALSH, Secretary of Labor
Case Number: 22-1428
Filed: March 18, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
June 24, 2022 Mary Corner v. Marty Walsh

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2022 Filing 6 10 copies of Appellant's brief filed by Appellant Mary L. Corner. Disk not required. REMINDER: Hearing notices are mailed shortly before the date of oral argument. Please note that counsel's unavailability for oral argument must be submitted by letter, filed electronically with the Clerk's Office, no later than the filing of the appellant's brief in a criminal case and the filing of an appellee's brief in a civil case. See Cir. R. 34(b)(3). The court's calendar is located at http://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/cal/argcalendar.pdf. Once scheduled, oral argument is rescheduled only in extraordinary circumstances. See Cir. R. 34(b)(4), (e). [6] [7232886] [22-1428] (MLM) [Entered: 04/29/2022 11:24 AM]
April 7, 2022 Filing 5 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Mary L. Corner. Prior or Related proceedings: Yes. 18-3655 [5] [7228265] [22-1428] (CAG) [Entered: 04/07/2022 04:29 PM]
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Appellant Mary L. Corner is directed to file the overdue Docketing Statement within 14 days from the date of this Rule to Show Cause. Docketing statement response due for Appellant Mary L. Corner by 04/14/2022. Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7020 2450 0002 1930 4478. [4] [7226458] [22-1428] (AD) [Entered: 03/31/2022 10:16 AM]
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: This court received notice from the District Court that the appellant paid the required docketing fee. Briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 04/27/2022 for Mary L. Corner. Appellee's brief due on or before 05/27/2022 for Marty Walsh. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 06/17/2022 for Appellant Mary L. Corner [3] [7225485] [22-1428] (CAG) [Entered: 03/28/2022 09:18 AM]
March 28, 2022 Filing 2 Filed notice from the District Court that the appeal docketing fee was received. [2] [7225484] [22-1428] (CAG) [Entered: 03/28/2022 09:17 AM]
March 18, 2022 Filing 1 U.S. civil case docketed. Fee due. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Mary L. Corner by 03/24/2022. Transcript information sheet due by 04/01/2022. Fee or IFP forms due on 04/01/2022 for Appellant Mary L. Corner [1] [7223784] [22-1428] (AP) [Entered: 03/18/2022 11:06 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Mary Corner v. Marty Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARY L. CORNER
Represented By: Mary L. Corner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARTY WALSH, Secretary of Labor
Represented By: Kathleen M. Flannery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?