William Richter v. David Gomez
Petitioner / Appellant: WILLIAM RICHTER
Respondent / Appellee: DAVID GOMEZ, Warden, Stateville Correctional Center
Case Number: 22-1718
Filed: April 27, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2022 Filing 3 Filed District Court order GRANTING Appellant William Richter leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Date IFP granted: 06/07/2022. Petitioners renewed motion for a certificate of appealability [71] is denied because he has not made a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right. 28 U.S.C. 2253(c)(2); Slack v. McDaniel, 529 U.S. 473, 484 (2000). Petitioners motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal [72] is granted because Petitioner is impoverished. The $505.00 in appellate fees are waived. Petitioners renewed motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis [77] is denied as moot since the prior motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis [72] was granted. Petitioners motion for production of the record [73] is denied without prejudice. The Clerk will forward the record to the Seventh Circuit as a matter of course. There is no need for a copy of the record to be sent to Petitioner at this time, or the court reporter to prepare transcripts of status hearings before this Court at this stage. Petitioner is advised that all matters are now complete before this Court and any future motion should be presented to the Seventh Circuit. [3] [7241249] [22-1718] (AP) [Entered: 06/08/2022 02:01 PM]
May 3, 2022 Filing 2 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant William Richter. [2] [7233664] [22-1718] (CG) [Entered: 05/03/2022 12:40 PM]
April 27, 2022 Filing 1 State prisoner's habeas corpus case docketed. Certificate of Appealability denied 03/31/2021. IFP pending in the District Court. Docketing statement filed. Fee or IFP forms due on 05/11/2022 for Appellant William Richter. Transcript information sheet due by 05/11/2022. [1] [7232719] [22-1718] (MM) [Entered: 04/28/2022 03:16 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: William Richter v. David Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: WILLIAM RICHTER
Represented By: William Richter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: DAVID GOMEZ, Warden, Stateville Correctional Center
Represented By: Katherine M. Doersch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?