Omar Hernandez v. Illinois Institute of Technology
Plaintiff / Appellant: OMAR HERNANDEZ, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Defendant / Appellee: ILLINOIS INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY
Case Number: 22-1741
Filed: April 29, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Contract Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2022 Filing 21 Amended Jurisdictional Statement filed by Appellant Omar Hernandez. [21] [7243392] [22-1741] (Abbott, Blake) [Entered: 06/21/2022 09:08 AM]
June 16, 2022 Filing 20 Paper copies of appellant brief filed by Appellant Omar Hernandez. [20] [7242885] [22-1741] (CAG) [Entered: 06/16/2022 11:15 AM]
June 14, 2022 Filing 19 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Elizabeth A. Thompson for Appellee Illinois Institute of Technology. [19] [7242415] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1741] [19] [7242415] [22-1741]--[Edited 06/14/2022 by HTP to reflect addition of counsel.] (Thompson, Elizabeth) [Entered: 06/14/2022 01:24 PM]
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Appellant Omar Hernandez shall file a paper captioned "Amended Jurisdictional Statement" that provides the omitted information noted in this order and otherwise complies with all the requirements of Fed.R.App.P. 28(a)(4) and Cir. Rule 28(a). The Clerk shall DISTRIBUTE, along with the briefs in this appeal, copies of this order and the "Amended Jurisdictional Statement" to the assigned merits panel. This order will not extend the time for any future briefs. Amended jurisdictional statement due no later than 06/21/2022 for Appellant Omar Hernandez. DW [18] [7242189] [22-1741] (AD) [Entered: 06/13/2022 04:01 PM]
June 10, 2022 Filing 16 Re-Submitted appellant brief by Blake G. Abbott for Appellant Omar Hernandez. [16] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [7241845] [22-1741] (Abbott, Blake) [Entered: 06/10/2022 03:29 PM]
June 10, 2022 Filing 15 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Daniel J. Kurowski for Appellant Omar Hernandez. [15] [7241734] (L-No; E-No; R-No) [22-1741] (Kurowski, Daniel) [Entered: 06/10/2022 11:04 AM]
June 10, 2022 Filing 14 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Steve W. Berman for Appellant Omar Hernandez. [14] [7241723] (L-No; E-No; R-No) [22-1741] (Berman, Steve) [Entered: 06/10/2022 11:01 AM]
June 8, 2022 Filing 17 Appellant's brief filed by Appellant Omar Hernandez. Paper copies due on 06/15/2022. Appellee's brief due on or before 07/08/2022 for Illinois Institute of Technology. Electronically Transmitted. REMINDER: Hearing notices are mailed shortly before the date of oral argument. Please note that counsel's unavailability for oral argument must be submitted by letter, filed electronically with the Clerk's Office, no later than the filing of the appellant's brief in a criminal case and the filing of an appellee's brief in a civil case. See Cir. R. 34(b)(3). The court's calendar is located at http://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/cal/argcalendar.pdf. Once scheduled, oral argument is rescheduled only in extraordinary circumstances. See Cir. R. 34(b)(4), (e). [17] [7241867] [22-1741] (MLM) [Entered: 06/10/2022 04:13 PM]
June 8, 2022 Filing 13 Brief deficiency letter sent to Appellant Omar Hernandez. [13] [7241408] [22-1741] (MLM) [Entered: 06/09/2022 09:27 AM]
June 8, 2022 Filing 12 Submitted appellant brief by Blake G. Abbott for Appellant Omar Hernandez. [12] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [7241348] [22-1741] (Abbott, Blake) [Entered: 06/08/2022 09:44 PM]
May 20, 2022 Filing 11 Amended Statement of Jurisdiction filed by Appellant Omar Hernandez. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [11] [7237733] [22-1741] (Kurowski, Daniel) [Entered: 05/20/2022 03:56 PM]
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The court, on its own motion, orders attorneys Steve W. Berman, Daniel John Kurowski, and Roy T. Willey, IV to show cause for their failure to comply with the court's order of May 6, 2022. That order explicitly required counsel to "identify by name the state of 'citizenship' of at least one plaintiff diverse from defendant." (Emphasis in original). Counsel did not do so. Accordingly, attorneys Steve W. Berman, Daniel John Kurowski, and Roy T. Willey, IV shall comply with the court's May 6, 2022 order, and do so no later than May 20, 2022. Counsel are advised that failure to respond may result in monetary or disciplinary sanctions. DW [10] [7236346] [22-1741] (CG) [Entered: 05/16/2022 12:57 PM]
May 13, 2022 Filing 9 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Hal R. Morris for Appellee Illinois Institute of Technology. [9] [7236102] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1741] (Morris, Hal) [Entered: 05/13/2022 02:49 PM]
May 13, 2022 Filing 8 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Blake Abbott for Appellant Omar Hernandez. [8] [7236026] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1741] [Edited 05/13/2022 by CG to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Abbott, Blake) [Entered: 05/13/2022 11:12 AM]
May 13, 2022 Filing 7 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Omar Hernandez. [7] [7235998] [22-1741] (Willey, Roy) [Entered: 05/13/2022 10:01 AM]
May 13, 2022 Filing 6 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Roy T. Willey, IV for Appellant Omar Hernandez. [6] [7235995] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1741] (Willey, Roy) [Entered: 05/13/2022 09:55 AM]
May 12, 2022 Filing 5 Amended Jurisdictional Statement filed by Appellant Omar Hernandez. [5] [7235785] [22-1741] (Kurowski, Daniel) [Entered: 05/12/2022 11:15 AM]
May 10, 2022 Filing 4 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney William Toby Eveland for Appellee Illinois Institute of Technology. [4] [7235185] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1741] [4] [7235185] [22-1741]--[Edited 05/10/2022 by HTP to reflect addition of counsel.] (Eveland, William) [Entered: 05/10/2022 11:09 AM]
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Appellant shall file a complete statement of jurisdiction that includes the omitted information. The statement is due on or before May 13, 2022. (See order for details) DW [3] [7234615] [22-1741] (AP) [Entered: 05/06/2022 02:44 PM]
May 6, 2022 Filing 2 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Omar Hernandez. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [2] [7234499] [22-1741] (Kurowski, Daniel) [Entered: 05/06/2022 10:39 AM]
April 29, 2022 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Transcript information sheet due by 05/13/2022. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Omar Hernandez by 05/06/2022. Appellant's brief due on or before 06/08/2022 for Omar Hernandez. [1] [7233232] [22-1741] (FP) [Entered: 05/02/2022 11:22 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Omar Hernandez v. Illinois Institute of Technology
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: OMAR HERNANDEZ, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Daniel John Kurowski
Represented By: Roy T. Willey IV
Represented By: Blake G. Abbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ILLINOIS INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY
Represented By: Hal R. Morris
Represented By: William T. Eveland
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?