Teresa Sykes v. Cook Incorporated, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: TERESA F. SYKES
Defendant / Appellee: COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL, LLC and WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS
Case Number: 22-1844
Filed: May 13, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Torts
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2022 Filing 15 Paper copies of appellant brief and appendix vol I and SEALED appendix vol II filed by Appellant Teresa F. Sykes. [15] [7244890] [22-1844] (SK) [Entered: 06/28/2022 09:28 AM]
June 27, 2022 Filing 14 SEALED Appendix vol II filed by Appellant Teresa F. Sykes, per order. [14] [7244637] Paper copies due on 07/05/2022 [22-1844] (SK) [Entered: 06/27/2022 10:58 AM]
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER issued GRANTING Motion to Maintain Volume Ii of Separate Appendix of Plaintiff-Appellant under Seal. [ # 10 ] The clerks office shall file under seal Volume II of the separate appendix tendered with this motion. SCR [13] [7244627] [22-1844] (AD) [Entered: 06/27/2022 10:38 AM]
June 22, 2022 Filing 12 Filed Appendix by Appellant Teresa F. Sykes. [12] [7243956] Paper copies due on 06/29/2022 [22-1844] (SK) [Entered: 06/22/2022 04:40 PM]
June 22, 2022 Filing 11 Appellant's brief filed by Appellant Teresa F. Sykes. Paper copies due on 06/29/2022. Electronically Transmitted. REMINDER: Hearing notices are mailed shortly before the date of oral argument. Please note that counsel's unavailability for oral argument must be submitted by letter, filed electronically with the Clerk's Office, no later than the filing of the appellant's brief in a criminal case and the filing of an appellee's brief in a civil case. See Cir. R. 34(b)(3). The court's calendar is located at http://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/cal/argcalendar.pdf. Once scheduled, oral argument is rescheduled only in extraordinary circumstances. See Cir. R. 34(b)(4), (e). [11] [7243954] [22-1844] (SK) [Entered: 06/22/2022 04:39 PM]
June 22, 2022 Filing 10 Motion by Appellant Teresa F. Sykes to seal Volume II of II Separate Appendix. [10] [7243923] [22-1844] (Stoller, Paul) [Entered: 06/22/2022 03:20 PM]
June 22, 2022 Filing 9 Submitted appellant brief by Paul L. Stoller, Jennifer C. Rethemeier and Michael E. Gallant for Appellant Teresa F. Sykes. [9] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [7243922] [22-1844] (Stoller, Paul) [Entered: 06/22/2022 03:18 PM]
May 18, 2022 Filing 8 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Teresa F. Sykes. [8] [7237149] [22-1844] (Stoller, Paul) [Entered: 05/18/2022 04:20 PM]
May 18, 2022 Filing 7 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Teresa F. Sykes. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [7] [7237146] [22-1844] (Stoller, Paul) [Entered: 05/18/2022 04:19 PM]
May 18, 2022 Filing 6 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Michael E. Gallant for Appellant Teresa F. Sykes. [6] [7237128] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1844][6] [7237128] [22-1844]--[Edited 05/18/2022 by HTP to reflect addition of counsel.] (Gallant, Michael) [Entered: 05/18/2022 03:59 PM]
May 18, 2022 Filing 5 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Jennifer Rethemeier for Appellant Teresa F. Sykes. [5] [7237127] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1844] [5] [7237127] [22-1844]--[Edited 05/18/2022 by HTP to reflect addition of counsel.] (Stoller, Paul) [Entered: 05/18/2022 03:56 PM]
May 18, 2022 Filing 4 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Paul L. Stoller for Appellant Teresa F. Sykes. [4] [7237123] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1844] (Stoller, Paul) [Entered: 05/18/2022 03:53 PM]
May 16, 2022 Filing 3 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Andrea Roberts Pierson for Appellees Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical, LLC and William Cook Europe APS. [3] [7236426] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1844] (Pierson, Andrea) [Entered: 05/16/2022 03:00 PM]
May 16, 2022 Filing 2 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Brian J. Paul for Appellees Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical, LLC and William Cook Europe APS. [2] [7236415] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1844] [2] [7236415] [22-1844]--[Edited 05/16/2022 by HTP to reflect addition of counsel.] (Paul, Brian) [Entered: 05/16/2022 02:55 PM]
May 13, 2022 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Teresa F. Sykes by 05/19/2022. Transcript information sheet due by 05/27/2022. Appellant's brief due on or before 06/22/2022 for Teresa F. Sykes. [1] [7236247] [22-1844] (MM) [Entered: 05/16/2022 10:26 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Teresa Sykes v. Cook Incorporated, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TERESA F. SYKES
Represented By: Paul Lincoln Stoller
Represented By: Michael E. Gallant
Represented By: Jennifer Cummins Rethemeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COOK INCORPORATED
Represented By: Brian James Paul
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COOK MEDICAL, LLC
Represented By: Brian James Paul
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS
Represented By: Brian James Paul
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?