Rustic Retreats Log Homes, Inc. v. Pioneer Log Homes of British Columbia Inc., et al
Plaintiff / Appellee: RUSTIC RETREATS LOG HOMES, INC., doing business as Pioneer Log Homes Midwest
Defendant / Appellant: PIONEER LOG HOMES OF BRITISH COLUMBIA INC. and PIONEER LOG HOMES OF BRITISH COLUMBIA, LTD.
Case Number: 22-1960
Filed: May 31, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Contract Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, the deadline for Attorney Wagner to respond is suspended pending further Court order. [7242695] [22-1868, 22-1960] (CG) [Entered: 06/15/2022 02:05 PM]
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing is SUSPENDED pending further court order. [8] [7242670] [22-1868, 22-1960] (HTP) [Entered: 06/15/2022 12:39 PM]
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This matter comes before the court on review of the Amended Docketing Statement filed by plaintiff-appellant on June 6, 2022. That review discloses that the statement remains inadequate. Accordingly, attorney K. Scott Wagner shall show cause for his failure to fully respond to the courts order of June 2, 2022, because he fails to provide the date that the judgment was entered. It is insufficient to provide the number of a district court docket entry. Further, the amended docketing statement fails to provide sufficient information as to the business structure of defendants Pioneer Log Homes of British Columbia, Inc. and Pioneer Log Homes of British Columbia Ltd. as business entities created under the laws of Canada. Attorney K. Scott Wagner shall file his response on or before June 15, 2022. Counsel is advised that failure to respond may result in monetary or disciplinary sanctions. DW [7] [7241271] [22-1868] (AD) [Entered: 06/08/2022 02:28 PM]
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: In the present case, plaintiff relies on diversity of citizenship for federal jurisdiction. However, appellants Circuit Rule 3(c) docketing statement fails to provide sufficient information as to the business structure of defendants Pioneer Log Homes of British Columbia, Inc. and Pioneer Log Homes of British Columbia, Ltd. as a business entities created under the laws of Canada. Particular attention is given to foreign corporations in diversity cases. We have said that parties cannot assume that foreign business entities enjoy the same corporate status as the United States understands it. See White Pearl Inversiones S.A. (Uruguay) v. Cemusa, Inc., 647 F3d 684, 686 (7th Cir. 2011). Therefore, appellants must provide more detail in their Jurisdictional Statement as to the business structure of defendants Pioneer Log Homes of British Columbia, Inc. and Pioneer Log Homes of British Columbia, Ltd. under the laws of Canada. Accordingly, appellants shall file a complete statement of jurisdiction that includes the omitted information. The statement is due on or before June 9, 2022. (See order for further details) DW [6] [7240053] [22-1960] (AD) [Entered: 06/02/2022 11:30 AM]
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The court, on its own motion, orders that these appeals are CONSOLIDATED for purposes of briefing and disposition. The briefing schedule is as follows: 1) The plaintiff shall file its opening brief and required short appendix in the main appeal docketed in 22-1868 on or before July 15, 2022. 2) The defendants shall file their combined responsive brief in the main appeal and opening brief and appendix in the cross-appeal docketed in 22-1960 on or before August 15, 2022. 3) The plaintiff shall file its combined reply brief, if any, in the main appeal and responsive brief in the cross-appeal on or before September 14, 2022. 4) The defendants shall file their reply brief, if any, in the cross-appeal on or before October 5, 2022. DW [5] [7240046] [22-1868, 22-1960] (AD) [Entered: 06/02/2022 11:22 AM]
June 2, 2022 Filing 4 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Colin T. Roth for Appellants Pioneer Log Homes of British Columbia Inc. and Pioneer Log Homes of British Columbia, Ltd.. [4] [7240028] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1960] -[Edited 06/02/2022 by ER - added Attorney Colin T. Ruth] (Roth, Colin) [Entered: 06/02/2022 10:55 AM]
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 07/15/2022 for Rustic Retreats Log Homes, Inc., Pioneer Log Homes of British Columbia Inc. and Pioneer Log Homes of British Columbia, Ltd.. Appellee's brief due on or before 08/15/2022 for Pioneer Log Homes of British Columbia Inc., Pioneer Log Homes of British Columbia, Ltd. and Rustic Retreats Log Homes, Inc. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 09/06/2022 for Appellants Rustic Retreats Log Homes, Inc., Pioneer Log Homes of British Columbia Inc. and Pioneer Log Homes of British Columbia, Ltd. RJS [7240006] [22-1868, 22-1960] (AD) [Entered: 06/02/2022 10:21 AM]
June 1, 2022 Filing 2 Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Wednesday, June 15, 2022 at 9:30 a.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. RJS [2] [7240003] [22-1868, 22-1960] (AD) [Entered: 06/02/2022 10:16 AM]
May 31, 2022 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 06/14/2022. Appellant's brief due on or before 07/11/2022 for Pioneer Log Homes of British Columbia Inc. and Pioneer Log Homes of British Columbia, Ltd. [1] [7239781] [22-1960] (AP) [Entered: 06/01/2022 11:51 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Rustic Retreats Log Homes, Inc. v. Pioneer Log Homes of British Columbia Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RUSTIC RETREATS LOG HOMES, INC., doing business as Pioneer Log Homes Midwest
Represented By: K. Scott Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: PIONEER LOG HOMES OF BRITISH COLUMBIA INC.
Represented By: Matthew V. Fisher
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Mandell
Represented By: Colin T. Ruth
Represented By: Colin Thomas Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: PIONEER LOG HOMES OF BRITISH COLUMBIA, LTD.
Represented By: Matthew V. Fisher
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Mandell
Represented By: Colin T. Ruth
Represented By: Colin Thomas Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?