Michael Ross v. First Financial Corporate Services, Inc., et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: MICHAEL ROSS
Defendant / Appellee: FIRST FINANCIAL CORPORATE SERVICES, INC., THOMAS SLEVIN and RICHARD STEBBINS
Case Number: 22-2081
Filed: June 17, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2022 Filing 13 Amended Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Michael Ross, per order. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [13] [7253485] [22-2081] (AP) [Entered: 08/09/2022 11:06 AM]
August 9, 2022 Filing 12 INSTANTER ORDER re: Motion for leave to file docketing statement instanter. 2. Motion to extend time to file appellant's brief [ # 11 ]IT IS ORDERED that the motion to file instanter is GRANTED. The clerk shall file instanter the electronically tendered amended docketing statement of the appellant. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the rule to show cause dated August 8, 2022, is DISCHARGED. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that the motion for extension is GRANTED, and briefing shall proceed as follows: [ # 10 ], Appellant's brief due on or before 09/09/2022 for Michael Ross. Appellee's brief due on or before 10/11/2022 for First Financial Corporate Services, Inc., Thomas Slevin and Richard Stebbins. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 11/01/2022 for Appellant Michael Ross. SCR [12] [7253471] [22-2081] (AP) [Entered: 08/09/2022 10:56 AM]
August 8, 2022 Filing 11 Motion filed by Appellant Michael Ross to file Motion to Extend Time to File Appellant Brief. [11] [7253351] [22-2081] (Henry, Bernard) [Entered: 08/08/2022 05:58 PM]
August 8, 2022 Filing 10 Instanter motion filed by Appellant Michael Ross to file Motion For Leave to File Docketing Statement Instanter. [10] [7253289] [22-2081] (Henry, Bernard) [Entered: 08/08/2022 04:06 PM]
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The court, on its own motion, orders attorney Kevin P. Brown to show cause for his failure to respond to the courts order of June 27, 2022. Attorney Kevin P. Brown shall file his response on or before August 15, 2022. Counsel is advised that failure to respond may result in monetary or disciplinary sanctions. DW. [9] [7253235] [22-2081] (HTP) [Entered: 08/08/2022 03:07 PM]
July 8, 2022 Filing 8 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Julia S. Wolf for Appellee First Financial Corporate Services, Inc.. [8] [7246857] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [22-2081] [8] [7246857] [22-2081]--[Edited 07/08/2022 by HTP to reflect addition of counsel.] (Wolf, Julia) [Entered: 07/08/2022 10:52 AM]
July 8, 2022 Filing 7 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Jeffrey L. Rudd for Appellee First Financial Corporate Services, Inc.. [7] [7246849] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-2081] (Rudd, Jeffrey) [Entered: 07/08/2022 10:45 AM]
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 08/15/2022 for Michael Ross. Appellees' brief due on or before 09/14/2022 for First Financial Corporate Services, Inc., Thomas Slevin and Richard Stebbins. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 10/05/2022 for Appellant Michael Ross. JNS [7245539] [22-2081] (HTP) [Entered: 06/30/2022 04:31 PM]
June 30, 2022 Filing 5 Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Friday, July 15, 2022 at 2:00p.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JNS. [5] [7245536] [22-2081] (HTP) [Entered: 06/30/2022 04:29 PM]
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Appellant again shall file a complete statement of jurisdiction that includes the omitted information. The statement is due on or before July 5, 2022. (See order for details) DW [4] [7244772] [22-2081] (AP) [Entered: 06/27/2022 03:56 PM]
June 24, 2022 Filing 3 Amended Jurisdictional Statement filed by Appellant Michael Ross. [3] [7244353] [22-2081] (Brown, Kevin) [Entered: 06/24/2022 09:51 AM]
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: The appellant shall file a complete statement of jurisdiction that includes the omitted information. The statement is due on or before June 29, 2022. (See order for details.) DW [2] [2] [7243840] [22-2081] (CG) [Entered: 06/22/2022 12:30 PM]
June 17, 2022 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 07/01/2022. Appellant's brief due on or before 07/27/2022 for Michael Ross. [1] [7243597] [22-2081] (PS) [Entered: 06/21/2022 02:54 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Michael Ross v. First Financial Corporate Services, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHAEL ROSS
Represented By: Kevin P. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FIRST FINANCIAL CORPORATE SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Rudd
Represented By: Julia Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THOMAS SLEVIN
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Rudd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RICHARD STEBBINS
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Rudd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?