Meredith Dawson v. Great Lakes Educational Loan Services, Inc., et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: MEREDITH D. DAWSON
Defendant / Appellee: GREAT LAKES EDUCATIONAL LOAN SERVICES, INC. and GREAT LAKES HIGHER EDUCATION CORPORATION
Case Number: 22-2189
Filed: July 7, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Contract Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE: Circuit Rule 46(a) requires lead counsel be admitted to practice within 30 days of the date the appeal/petition was docketed. The rule also requires any attorney wishing to present oral argument to be admitted. Our records indicate as of this date Attorney Jeffrey R. Krinsk for Appellant Meredith D. Dawson has/have not been admitted to practice in this court. Within 21 days, please file your application for admission by going to: https://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/forms/forms7.htm and choosing the link, "Application for Admission to Practice in the Seventh Circuit". [19] [7253228] [22-2189] (LJ) [Entered: 08/08/2022 02:57 PM]
August 8, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE: Circuit Rule 46(a) requires lead counsel be admitted to practice within 30 days of the date the appeal/petition was docketed. The rule also requires any attorney wishing to present oral argument to be admitted. Our records indicate as of this date Attorney David J. Harris, Jr. for Appellant Meredith D. Dawson has/have not been admitted to practice in this court. Within 21 days, please file your application for admission by going to: https://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/forms/forms7.htm and choosing the link, "Application for Admission to Practice in the Seventh Circuit". [18] [7253215] [22-2189] (LJ) [Entered: 08/08/2022 02:48 PM]
August 4, 2022 Filing 17 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Paul A. Kinne for Appellant Meredith D. Dawson. [17] [7252680] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [22-2189] (Kinne, Paul) [Entered: 08/04/2022 04:50 PM]
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 10/04/2022 for Meredith D. Dawson. Appellees' brief due on or before 11/18/2022 for Great Lakes Educational Loan Services, Inc. and Great Lakes Higher Education Corporation. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 12/16/2022 for Appellant Meredith D. Dawson. JB [7252080] [22-2189] (HTP) [Entered: 08/03/2022 07:08 AM]
July 25, 2022 Filing 15 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Heath P. Straka for Appellant Meredith D. Dawson. [15] [7250133] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [22-2189] (Straka, Heath) [Entered: 07/25/2022 09:17 AM]
July 20, 2022 Filing 14 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney David J. Harris, Jr. for Appellant Meredith D. Dawson. [14] [7249604] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-2189] (Harris, David) [Entered: 07/20/2022 05:00 PM]
July 20, 2022 Filing 13 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Michael J. Modl for Appellant Meredith D. Dawson. [13] [7249505] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [22-2189] (Modl, Michael) [Entered: 07/20/2022 02:06 PM]
July 20, 2022 Filing 12 Amended Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Meredith D. Dawson. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [12] [7249495] [22-2189] (Modl, Michael) [Entered: 07/20/2022 01:43 PM]
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: A review of appellants Corrected Docketing Statement filed on July 14, 2022, reveals that it remains inadequate. Heres why. The corrected Circuit Rule 3(c) docketing statement fails to identify separately the state of incorporation and the state of the principal place of business of the corporate defendants. Appellant must provide this information. See U.S.C. 1332(c)(1). Accordingly, the appellant shall file a complete statement of jurisdiction that includes the omitted information. The statement is due on or before July 25, 2022. DW [11] [7248882] [22-2189] (FP) [Entered: 07/18/2022 03:35 PM]
July 15, 2022 Filing 10 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Meredith D. Dawson. [10] [7248599] [22-2189] (Modl, Michael) [Entered: 07/15/2022 03:33 PM]
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 09/02/2022 for Meredith D. Dawson. Appellees' brief due on or before 10/03/2022 for Great Lakes Educational Loan Services, Inc. and Great Lakes Higher Education Corporation. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 10/24/2022 for Appellant Meredith D. Dawson. JB [7248386] [22-2189] (HTP) [Entered: 07/14/2022 05:22 PM]
July 14, 2022 Filing 8 Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted via Zoom, Tuesday, August 2, 2022 at 2:00pm. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JB. [8] [7248385] [22-2189] (HTP) [Entered: 07/14/2022 05:20 PM]
July 14, 2022 Filing 7 Amended Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Meredith D. Dawson. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [7] [7248345] [22-2189] (Modl, Michael) [Entered: 07/14/2022 03:51 PM]
July 12, 2022 Filing 6 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Aaron R. Wegrzyn for Appellees Great Lakes Educational Loan Services, Inc. and Great Lakes Higher Education Corporation. [6] [7247548] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [22-2189] (Wegrzyn, Aaron) [Entered: 07/12/2022 09:40 AM]
July 12, 2022 Filing 5 Added Attorney(s) Anne-Louise T. Mittal for party(s) Appellee Great Lakes Educational Loan Services, Inc. Appellee Great Lakes Higher Education Corporation, in case 22-2189 per disclosure statement. Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Anne-Louise T. Mittal for Appellees Great Lakes Educational Loan Services, Inc. and Great Lakes Higher Education Corporation. Additional Parties: Jill Leitl, David Lentz, Michael Walker. [5] [7247524] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [22-2189]--[Edited 07/12/2022 by AD to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Mittal, Anne-Louise) [Entered: 07/12/2022 08:32 AM]
July 12, 2022 Filing 4 Added Attorney(s) Eric G. Pearson for party(s) Appellee Great Lakes Educational Loan Services, Inc. Appellee Great Lakes Higher Education Corporation, in case 22-2189 per disclosure statement. Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Eric G. Pearson for Appellees Great Lakes Educational Loan Services, Inc. and Great Lakes Higher Education Corporation. Additional Parties: Jill Leitl, David Lentz, Michael Walker. [4] [7247523] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [22-2189]--[Edited 07/12/2022 by AD to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Pearson, Eric) [Entered: 07/12/2022 08:26 AM]
July 12, 2022 Filing 3 Added Attorney(s) Thomas L. Shriner Jr. for party(s) Appellee Great Lakes Educational Loan Services, Inc. Appellee Great Lakes Higher Education Corporation, in case 22-2189 per disclosure statement. Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Thomas L. Shriner, Jr. for Appellees Great Lakes Educational Loan Services, Inc. and Great Lakes Higher Education Corporation. Additional Parties: Jill Leitl, David Lentz, Michael Walker. [3] [7247522] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-2189]--[Edited 07/12/2022 by AD to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Shriner, Thomas) [Entered: 07/12/2022 08:17 AM]
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: Appellant shall file a complete statement of jurisdiction that includes the omitted information. The statement is due on or before July 15, 2022. (See order for further details) DW [2] [2] [7247171] [22-2189] (PS) [Entered: 07/11/2022 09:58 AM]
July 7, 2022 Filing 1 Private U.S. civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 07/21/2022. Appellant's brief due on or before 08/16/2022 for Meredith D. Dawson. [1] [7246842] [22-2189]--[Edited 07/12/2022 by CMD to update text.] (HTP) [Entered: 07/08/2022 10:33 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Meredith Dawson v. Great Lakes Educational Loan Services, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MEREDITH D. DAWSON
Represented By: David J. Harris Jr.
Represented By: Paul A. Kinne
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Krinsk
Represented By: Michael J. Modl
Represented By: Heath Paul Straka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GREAT LAKES EDUCATIONAL LOAN SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Thomas L. Shriner Jr.
Represented By: Aaron R. Wegrzyn
Represented By: Anne-Louise T. Mittal
Represented By: Eric G. Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GREAT LAKES HIGHER EDUCATION CORPORATION
Represented By: Thomas L. Shriner Jr.
Represented By: Aaron R. Wegrzyn
Represented By: Anne-Louise T. Mittal
Represented By: Eric G. Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?