Concepts Design Furniture, Inc., et al v. Fisher & Broyles LLP, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: CONCEPTS DESIGN FURNITURE, INC., COMPTOIR DES INDES INC., DAVID QUAKNINE, CONTAINER DIRECT INTERNATIONAL FURNITURE, INC. and CONCEPTS DESIGN INNOVATION FURNITURE, INC.
Defendant / Appellee: FISHER & BROYLES LLP, also known as FisherBroyles LLP and ALASTAIR J. WARR
Case Number: 22-2303
Filed: July 22, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Contract Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE: Circuit Rule 46(a) requires lead counsel be admitted to practice within 30 days of the date the appeal/petition was docketed. The rule also requires any attorney wishing to present oral argument to be admitted. Our records indicate as of this date Attorney William Claiborne Dickinson for Appellees Fisher & Broyles LLP and Alastair J. Warr has/have not been admitted to practice in this court. Within 21 days, please file your application for admission by going to: https://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/forms/forms7.htm and choosing the link, "Application for Admission to Practice in the Seventh Circuit". [11] [7258719] [22-2303] (LJ) [Entered: 09/06/2022 03:03 PM]
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellants' brief due on or before 10/17/2022 for Comptoir Des Indes Inc., Concepts Design Furniture, Inc., Concepts Design Innovation Furniture, Inc., Container Direct International Furniture, Inc. and David Quaknine. Appellees' brief due on or before 12/07/2022 for Fisher & Broyles LLP and Alastair J. Warr. Appellants' reply brief, if any, is due on or before 01/11/2023 for Appellants Comptoir Des Indes Inc., Concepts Design Furniture, Inc., Concepts Design Innovation Furniture, Inc., Container Direct International Furniture, Inc. and David Quaknine. JB [7255262] [22-2303] (CG) [Entered: 08/18/2022 08:47 AM]
August 10, 2022 Filing 9 Amended Jurisdictional Statement filed by Appellants Comptoir Des Indes Inc., Concepts Design Furniture, Inc., Concepts Design Innovation Furniture, Inc., Container Direct International Furniture, Inc. and David Quaknine. [9] [7253948] [22-2303] (Tahmassebi, Amir) [Entered: 08/10/2022 06:49 PM]
August 3, 2022 Filing 8 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellants Comptoir Des Indes Inc., Concepts Design Furniture, Inc., Concepts Design Innovation Furniture, Inc., Container Direct International Furniture, Inc. and David Quaknine. [8] [7252325] [22-2303] (Tahmassebi, Amir) [Entered: 08/03/2022 05:01 PM]
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The appellants shall file a complete statement of jurisdiction that includes the omitted information. The statement is due on or before August 10, 2022. (See order for details). DW [7] [7252279] [22-2303] (AP) [Entered: 08/03/2022 03:41 PM]
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellants' brief due on or before 09/19/2022 for Comptoir Des Indes Inc., Concepts Design Furniture, Inc., Concepts Design Innovation Furniture, Inc., Container Direct International Furniture, Inc. and David Quaknine. Appellees' brief due on or before 10/19/2022 for Fisher & Broyles LLP and Alastair J. Warr. Appellants' reply brief, if any, is due on or before 11/09/2022 for Appellants Comptoir Des Indes Inc., Concepts Design Furniture, Inc., Concepts Design Innovation Furniture, Inc., Container Direct International Furniture, Inc. and David Quaknine. JB [7251882] [22-2303] (ER) [Entered: 08/02/2022 11:33 AM]
August 2, 2022 Filing 5 Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by Zoom, Wednesday, August 17, 2022 at 2:00 p.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JB. [5] [7251876] [22-2303] (ER) [Entered: 08/02/2022 11:25 AM]
July 28, 2022 Filing 4 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Melinda S. Kollross for Appellees Fisher & Broyles LLP and Alastair J. Warr. [4] [7251109] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-2303]--[Edited 07/28/2022 by PS - to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Kollross, Melinda) [Entered: 07/28/2022 11:09 AM]
July 27, 2022 Filing 3 Docketing Statement filed by Appellants Comptoir Des Indes Inc., Concepts Design Furniture, Inc., Concepts Design Innovation Furniture, Inc., Container Direct International Furniture, Inc. and David Quaknine. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [3] [7251031] [22-2303] (Tahmassebi, Amir) [Entered: 07/27/2022 06:18 PM]
July 27, 2022 Filing 2 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Amir R. Tahmassebi for Appellants Comptoir Des Indes Inc., Concepts Design Furniture, Inc., Container Direct International Furniture, Inc., Concepts Design Innovation Furniture, Inc. and David Quaknine. [2] [7251030] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-2303] (Tahmassebi, Amir) [Entered: 07/27/2022 06:15 PM]
July 22, 2022 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellants Comptoir Des Indes Inc., Concepts Design Furniture, Inc., Concepts Design Innovation Furniture, Inc., Container Direct International Furniture, Inc. and David Quaknine by 07/27/2022. Transcript information sheet due by 08/05/2022. Appellant's brief due on or before 08/31/2022 for Comptoir Des Indes Inc., Concepts Design Furniture, Inc., Concepts Design Innovation Furniture, Inc., Container Direct International Furniture, Inc. and David Quaknine. [1] [7250171] [22-2303] (HTP) [Entered: 07/25/2022 10:27 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Concepts Design Furniture, Inc., et al v. Fisher & Broyles LLP, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CONCEPTS DESIGN FURNITURE, INC.
Represented By: Amir R. Tahmassebi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: COMPTOIR DES INDES INC.
Represented By: Amir R. Tahmassebi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAVID QUAKNINE
Represented By: Amir R. Tahmassebi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CONTAINER DIRECT INTERNATIONAL FURNITURE, INC.
Represented By: Amir R. Tahmassebi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CONCEPTS DESIGN INNOVATION FURNITURE, INC.
Represented By: Amir R. Tahmassebi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FISHER & BROYLES LLP, also known as FisherBroyles LLP
Represented By: William Claiborne Dickinson
Represented By: Melinda S. Kollross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALASTAIR J. WARR
Represented By: William Claiborne Dickinson
Represented By: Melinda S. Kollross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?