Aluminum Recovery Technologies, Inc. v. Ace American Insurance Company
Plaintiff / Appellant: ALUMINUM RECOVERY TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Defendant / Appellee: ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 22-2556
Filed: September 2, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 12/16/2022 for Aluminum Recovery Technologies, Inc.. Appellee's brief due on or before 01/30/2023 for Ace American Insurance Company. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 02/27/2023 for Appellant Aluminum Recovery Technologies, Inc. JB [7263027] [22-2556] (FP) [Entered: 09/26/2022 03:37 PM]
September 26, 2022 Filing 8 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Thomas B. Orlando for Appellee Ace American Insurance Company. [8] [7262858] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-2556] [8] [7262858] [22-2556]--[Edited 09/26/2022 by HTP to reflect addition of counsel.] (Orlando, Thomas) [Entered: 09/26/2022 11:04 AM]
September 20, 2022 Filing 7 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Aluminum Recovery Technologies, Inc.. [7] [7261863] [22-2556] (HTP) [Entered: 09/20/2022 04:40 PM]
September 16, 2022 Filing 6 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Aluminum Recovery Technologies, Inc.. [6] [7261091] [22-2556] (Young, Douglas) [Entered: 09/16/2022 01:44 PM]
September 8, 2022 Filing 5 Statement of Jurisdiction filed by Appellant Aluminum Recovery Technologies, Inc.. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [5] [7259330] [22-2556] (Young, Douglas) [Entered: 09/08/2022 01:12 PM]
September 8, 2022 Filing 4 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Douglas Young for Appellant Aluminum Recovery Technologies, Inc.. [4] [7259328] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-2556] (Young, Douglas) [Entered: 09/08/2022 01:10 PM]
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 10/26/2022 for Aluminum Recovery Technologies, Inc.. Appellee's brief due on or before 11/25/2022 for Ace American Insurance Company. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 12/16/2022 for Appellant Aluminum Recovery Technologies, Inc. JB [7259197] [22-2556] (CG) [Entered: 09/08/2022 08:59 AM]
September 8, 2022 Filing 2 Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted via Zoom, Monday, September 26, 2022 at 2:00 p.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JB. [2] [7259192] [22-2556] (CG) [Entered: 09/08/2022 08:52 AM]
September 2, 2022 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Aluminum Recovery Technologies, Inc. by 09/08/2022. Transcript information sheet due by 09/16/2022. Appellant's brief due on or before 10/12/2022 for Aluminum Recovery Technologies, Inc. [1] [7258400] [22-2556] (ER) [Entered: 09/02/2022 12:25 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Aluminum Recovery Technologies, Inc. v. Ace American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ALUMINUM RECOVERY TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Represented By: Douglas Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Michael L. Foran
Represented By: Thomas B. Orlando
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?