Orion Eddlemon v. Bradley University
Plaintiff / Appellee: ORION EDDLEMON, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Defendant / Appellant: BRADLEY UNIVERSITY
Case Number: 22-2560
Filed: September 7, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Contract Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file appellant's brief [ # 7 ] Appellant's brief due on or before 11/16/2022 for Bradley University. Appellee's brief due on or before 12/16/2022 for Orion Eddlemon. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 01/06/2023 for Appellant Bradley University CDH [8] [7262517] [22-2560] (AP) [Entered: 09/23/2022 09:56 AM]
September 22, 2022 Filing 7 Motion filed by Appellant Bradley University to extend time to file appellant brief. [7] [7262428] [22-2560] (Ostfeld, Gregory) [Entered: 09/22/2022 04:02 PM]
September 22, 2022 Filing 6 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Bradley University. [6] [7262154] [22-2560] (CG) [Entered: 09/22/2022 09:06 AM]
September 19, 2022 Filing 5 Amended Jurisdictional Statement filed by Appellant Bradley University. [5] [7261396] [22-2560] (Ostfeld, Gregory) [Entered: 09/19/2022 02:41 PM]
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: A review of the Jurisdictional Statement filed by appellant on September 14, 2022, reveals that the 3(c) statement remains inadequate. Heres why. Appellant's Circuit Rule 3(c) docketing statement fails to identify the state of citizenship of the plaintiff class members listed on page 2. Appellant must provide this information. It is insufficient, for purposes of diversity jurisdiction, to disclose the residency of these plaintiffs, citizenship matters, not residency. See Meyerson v. Harrahs East Chicago Casino, 299 F.3d 616, 617 (7th Cir. 2002) (residency and citizenship are not synonyms). Accordingly, the appellant shall file a complete statement of jurisdiction that includes the omitted information. The statement is due on or before September 22, 2022. DW [4] [4] [7260844] [22-2560] (CG) [Entered: 09/15/2022 04:00 PM]
September 14, 2022 Filing 3 Statement of Jurisdiction filed by Appellant Bradley University. Prior or Related proceedings: Yes. 22-8010 [3] [7260526] [22-2560] (Ostfeld, Gregory) [Entered: 09/14/2022 02:21 PM]
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: In the present case, appellant claims that the district court had jurisdiction based on the Class Action Fairness Act. See 28 U.S.C. 1332 (d). Appellants Circuit Rule 3(c) docketing statement, however, fails to identify, by name, and the state of citizenship of at least one plaintiff who is diverse from the defendant. See Dancel v. Groupon, Inc, 940 F.3d 381 (7th Cir. 2019) Accordingly, appellant shall file a complete statement of jurisdiction that includes the omitted information. The statement is due on or before September 16, 2022. (See order for further details) DW [2] [2] [7259564] [22-2560] (PS) [Entered: 09/09/2022 01:22 PM]
September 7, 2022 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 09/21/2022. Appellant's brief due on or before 10/17/2022 for Bradley University. [1] [7259359] [22-2560] (PS) [Entered: 09/08/2022 02:31 PM]
September 7, 2022 Case transferred from Miscellaneous Docket No. 22-8010. [7259362-2] [7259362] [22-2560, 22-8010] (PS) [Entered: 09/08/2022 02:36 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Orion Eddlemon v. Bradley University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ORION EDDLEMON, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: Matthew Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: BRADLEY UNIVERSITY
Represented By: Kara Angeletti
Represented By: Tiffany S. Fordyce
Represented By: Gregory E. Ostfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?