Brad Martin v. Actavis Inc., et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: BRAD MARTIN
Defendant / Appellee: ACTAVIS INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA INC. and ACTAVIS LABORATORIES UT, INC.
Case Number: 22-2675
Filed: September 21, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Torts
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re: Motion to temporarily seal two documents, filed on 11/14/2022. The appellees shall respond to the appellants motion by November 23, 2022. The response must specifically address, under the standards announced in our caselaw, why the documents at issue should remain under seal. See, e.g., Baxter Intl, Inc. v. Abbott Labys, 297 F.3d 544 (7th Cir. 2002). This order does not affect the current briefing schedule. The court, however, recognizes that an extension of the briefing schedule may become necessary depending on the resolution of this motion. JEH [15] [7273690] [22-2664, 22-2675] (FP) [Entered: 11/16/2022 01:35 PM]
November 14, 2022 Filing 14 Brief deficiency letter sent to Appellant Brad Martin in 22-2664, 22-2675. [14] [7273323] [22-2664, 22-2675]--[Edited 11/15/2022 by SK] (SK) [Entered: 11/15/2022 08:44 AM]
November 14, 2022 Filing 13 Motion by Appellant Brad Martin in 22-2664, 22-2675 to seal two exhibits in Appellant's Short Appendix (temporarily). [13] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. [7273312] [22-2664, 22-2675] (O'Brien, James) [Entered: 11/14/2022 11:51 PM]
November 14, 2022 Filing 12 Submitted Appendix by James Griffin O'Brien for Appellant Brad Martin in 22-2664, 22-2675. [12] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [7273311] [22-2664, 22-2675] (O'Brien, James) [Entered: 11/14/2022 11:48 PM]
November 14, 2022 Filing 11 Submitted appellant brief by James Griffin O'Brien for Appellant Brad Martin in 22-2664, 22-2675. [11] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [7273309] [22-2664, 22-2675] (O'Brien, James) [Entered: 11/14/2022 11:44 PM]
October 28, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE: Circuit Rule 46(a) requires lead counsel be admitted to practice within 30 days of the date the appeal/petition was docketed. The rule also requires any attorney wishing to present oral argument to be admitted. Our records indicate as of this date Attorney Jeffrey D. Geoppinger for Appellees Actavis Inc., Actavis Pharma Inc. and Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc. in 22-2664, 22-2675 has/have not been admitted to practice in this court. Within 21 days, please file your application for admission by going to: https://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/forms/forms7.htm and choosing the link, "Application for Admission to Practice in the Seventh Circuit". [10] [7269728] [22-2664, 22-2675] (LJ) [Entered: 10/28/2022 11:15 AM]
October 26, 2022 Filing 9 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney James Griffin O'Brien for Appellant Brad Martin in 22-2664, 22-2675. [9] [7269003] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-2664, 22-2675] (O'Brien, James) [Entered: 10/26/2022 08:56 AM]
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re: Appellants motion to waive duplicate appellate fee. The motion is GRANTED. No additional fee is required for appeal no. 22-2675. See Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(4)(B)(iii). [ # 7 ] CDH [8] [7265551] [22-2664, 22-2675] (HTP) [Entered: 10/11/2022 09:05 AM]
October 5, 2022 Filing 7 Motion filed by Appellant Brad Martin in 22-2664, 22-2675 to Waive Duplicate Filing Fee. [7] [7264898] [22-2664, 22-2675] (O'Brien, James) [Entered: 10/05/2022 02:09 PM]
October 4, 2022 Filing 6 Filed Notice of Appellant's Transcript Order and Statement of Appellate Issues by Appellant Brad Martin in 22-2664, 22-2675. [6] [7264751] [22-2664, 22-2675] (O'Brien, James) [Entered: 10/04/2022 10:04 PM]
October 4, 2022 Filing 5 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Brad Martin in 22-2664, 22-2675. [5] [7264750] [22-2664, 22-2675] (O'Brien, James) [Entered: 10/04/2022 10:00 PM]
September 28, 2022 Filing 4 Amended Jurisdictional Statement filed by Appellant Brad Martin in 22-2664, 22-2675. [4] [7263515] [22-2664, 22-2675] (O'Brien, James) [Entered: 09/28/2022 02:36 PM]
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 11/14/2022 for Brad Martin. Appellees' brief due on or before 12/14/2022 for Actavis Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc. and Actavis Pharma Inc.. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 01/05/2023 for Appellant Brad Martin. Appellant shall promptly pay the appellate filing and docketing fees in 22-2675. JNS [7263442] [22-2664, 22-2675] (CG) [Entered: 09/28/2022 12:19 PM]
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: The court, on its own motion, orders that these appeals are CONSOLIDATED for purposes of briefing and disposition. The briefing schedule is as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 10/31/2022 for Brad Martin. Appellees' brief due on or before 11/30/2022 for Actavis Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc. and Actavis Pharma Inc.. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 12/21/2022 for Appellant Brad Martin. Plaintiff-appellant is further reminded to pay the appellate filing and docketing fees in 22-2675, and to do so promptly. (See order for further details). DW [2] [7263314] [22-2664, 22-2675] (HTP) [Entered: 09/27/2022 04:09 PM]
September 21, 2022 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee due. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 10/05/2022. Fee or IFP forms due on 10/05/2022 for Appellant Brad Martin. [1] [7262244] [22-2675] (MM) [Entered: 09/22/2022 11:26 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Brad Martin v. Actavis Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BRAD MARTIN
Represented By: James G. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ACTAVIS INC.
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Geoppinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ACTAVIS PHARMA INC.
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Geoppinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ACTAVIS LABORATORIES UT, INC.
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Geoppinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?