Steven F. Helfand v. TikTok Inc.
Defendant: TIKTOK INC.
Plaintiff / Appellee: PLAINTIFFS' CO-LEAD COUNSEL and PLAINTIFFS' LIAISON COUNSEL
Appellant: STEVEN F. HELFAND
Defendant / Appellee: DEFENDANTS' LEAD COUNSEL
Case Number: 22-2682
Filed: September 21, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: This cause is DISMISSED pursuant to F.R.A.P. 42(b). Mandate issued, no record to be returned. [ # 12 ][13][7265980] [22-2682] (HTP) [Entered: 10/12/2022 01:27 PM]
October 12, 2022 FOR COURT USE ONLY: Certified copy of 10/12/2022 Final Order with Mandate sent to the District Court Clerk. [7265987-2] [7265987] [22-2682] (HTP) [Entered: 10/12/2022 01:39 PM]
October 11, 2022 Filing 12 Motion filed by Appellees Plaintiffs' Co-Lead Counsel, Defendants' Lead Counsel and Appellant Steven F. Helfand to dismiss case. [12] [7265695] [22-2682] (Carroll, Katrina) [Entered: 10/11/2022 01:26 PM]
October 6, 2022 Filing 11 Filed Reply by Appellee Plaintiffs' Co-Lead Counsel Attorney Elizabeth A. Fegan to Motion to Dismiss of Plaintiffs-Appellees. [11][7265206] [22-2682] (Fegan, Elizabeth) [Entered: 10/06/2022 03:13 PM]
October 5, 2022 Filing 10 Filed Response in Opposition by Appellant Steven F. Helfand to Motion to Dismiss on 10/03/22. [10][7264754] [22-2682] (Helfand, Steven) [Entered: 10/05/2022 07:47 AM]
October 3, 2022 Filing 9 Motion filed by Appellee Plaintiffs' Co-Lead Counsel to dismiss case. [9] [7264474] [22-2682] (Fegan, Elizabeth) [Entered: 10/03/2022 05:04 PM]
October 3, 2022 Filing 8 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Elizabeth A. Fegan for Appellee Plaintiffs' Co-Lead Counsel. Additional Parties: Plaintiffs and the Class. [8] [7264470] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-2682] (Fegan, Elizabeth) [Entered: 10/03/2022 04:53 PM]
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re: Appellants unopposed motion for electronic filing. [ # 6 ] The motion is GRANTED. Appellant Steven Helfand is granted leave to use the Electronic Case Filing system for filing material in this appeal. This courts Electronic Case Filing Procedures, the Electronic Case Filing User Manual, and answers to frequently asked questions regarding Electronic Case Filing are available at the Seventh Circuits web site: http://www.ca7.uscourts.gov. JEH [7] [7263853] [22-2682] (PS) [Entered: 09/29/2022 02:44 PM]
September 28, 2022 Filing 6 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Steven F. Helfand for electronic filing. [6] [7263558] [22-2682] (PS) [Entered: 09/28/2022 03:13 PM]
September 28, 2022 Filing 5 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Steven F. Helfand. [5] [7263552] [22-2682] (PS) [Entered: 09/28/2022 03:11 PM]
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: This court received notice from the District Court that the appellant paid the required docketing fee. Briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 10/28/2022 for Steven F. Helfand. Appellee's brief due on or before 11/28/2022 for Defendants' Lead Counsel, Plaintiffs' Co-Lead Counsel and Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 12/19/2022 for Appellant Steven F. Helfand [4] [7263462] [22-2682] (CAG) [Entered: 09/28/2022 01:10 PM]
September 28, 2022 Filing 3 Filed notice from the District Court that the appeal docketing fee was received. [3] [7263460] [22-2682] (CAG) [Entered: 09/28/2022 01:08 PM]
September 26, 2022 Filing 2 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Steven F. Helfand. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [2] [7262796] [22-2682] (AD) [Entered: 09/26/2022 09:22 AM]
September 21, 2022 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee due. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Steven F. Helfand by 09/27/2022. Transcript information sheet due by 10/05/2022. Fee or IFP forms due on 10/05/2022 for Appellant Steven F. Helfand. [1] [7262295] [22-2682] (ER) [Entered: 09/22/2022 12:50 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Steven F. Helfand v. TikTok Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PLAINTIFFS' CO-LEAD COUNSEL
Represented By: Katrina Carroll Esq.
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Fegan
Represented By: Ekwan E. Rhow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PLAINTIFFS' LIAISON COUNSEL
Represented By: Shannon M. McNulty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: STEVEN F. HELFAND
Represented By: Steven F. Helfand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEFENDANTS' LEAD COUNSEL
Represented By: Anthony J. Weibell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIKTOK INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?