Firestone Financial, LLC v. WA Gym Naperville North, LLC, et al
Plaintiff / Appellee: FIRESTONE FINANCIAL, LLC
Defendant / Appellant: WA GYM NAPERVILLE NORTH, LLC, WA GYM DOWNERS GROVE, LLC, WORKOUT ANYTIME DARIEN, INC., WA NAPERVILLE, INC., formerly known as Workout Anytime Naperville, Inc. and MICHAEL P. MUFARREH
Case Number: 22-2783
Filed: October 6, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Contract Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re: Appellants motion for voluntary dismissal. [ # 4 ] This cause is DISMISSED pursuant to F.R.A.P. 42(b). Mandate issued, no record to be returned. [5][7268743] [22-2783] (PS) [Entered: 10/25/2022 11:40 AM]
October 25, 2022 FOR COURT USE ONLY: Certified copy of 10/25/2022 Final Order with Mandate sent to the District Court Clerk. [7268753-2] [7268753] [22-2783] (PS) [Entered: 10/25/2022 11:49 AM]
October 24, 2022 Filing 4 Motion filed by Appellants Michael P. Mufarreh, WA Gym Downers Grove, LLC, WA Gym Naperville North, LLC, WA Naperville, Inc. and Workout Anytime Darien, Inc. to dismiss case. [4] [7268250] [22-2783] (Wawrzyn, Matthew) [Entered: 10/24/2022 07:49 AM]
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Appellants Michael P. Mufarreh, WA Gym Downers Grove, LLC, WA Gym Naperville North, LLC, WA Naperville, Inc. and Workout Anytime Darien, Inc. is directed to file the overdue Docketing Statement within 14 days from the date of this Rule to Show Cause. AD. Docketing statement response due for Appellants Michael P. Mufarreh, WA Gym Downers Grove, LLC, WA Gym Naperville North, LLC, WA Naperville, Inc. and Workout Anytime Darien, Inc. by 11/04/2022. [3] [7268017] [22-2783] (AD) [Entered: 10/21/2022 09:21 AM]
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: Appellants shall file, on or before October 24, 2022, a brief memorandum stating why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. A motion for voluntary dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) will satisfy this requirement. Briefing shall be SUSPENDED pending further court order. (See order for further details). [7265682] DW [2] [7265682] [22-2783] (HTP) [Entered: 10/11/2022 12:46 PM]
October 6, 2022 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellants Michael P. Mufarreh, WA Gym Downers Grove, LLC, WA Gym Naperville North, LLC, WA Naperville, Inc. and Workout Anytime Darien, Inc. by 10/13/2022. Transcript information sheet due by 10/20/2022. Appellants' brief due on or before 11/15/2022 for Michael P. Mufarreh, WA Gym Downers Grove, LLC, WA Gym Naperville North, LLC, WA Naperville, Inc. and Workout Anytime Darien, Inc. [1] [7265444] [22-2783] (PS) [Entered: 10/07/2022 02:40 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Firestone Financial, LLC v. WA Gym Naperville North, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: FIRESTONE FINANCIAL, LLC
Represented By: Charles Randall Woolley II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: WA GYM NAPERVILLE NORTH, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Michael Wawrzyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: WA GYM DOWNERS GROVE, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Michael Wawrzyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: WORKOUT ANYTIME DARIEN, INC.
Represented By: Matthew Michael Wawrzyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: WA NAPERVILLE, INC., formerly known as Workout Anytime Naperville, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Michael Wawrzyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MICHAEL P. MUFARREH
Represented By: Matthew Michael Wawrzyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?