Washington County Water Company, Inc. v. City of Sparta
Plaintiff / Appellant: WASHINGTON COUNTY WATER COMPANY, INC.
Defendant / Appellee: CITY OF SPARTA
Case Number: 22-2942
Filed: October 28, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 01/31/2023 for Washington County Water Company, Inc.. Appellee's brief due on or before 03/02/2023 for City of Sparta. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 03/23/2023 for Appellant Washington County Water Company, Inc.. JB [7278934] [22-2942] (HTP) [Entered: 12/13/2022 10:50 AM]
November 15, 2022 Filing 8 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Washington County Water Company, Inc. [8] [7273358] [22-2942] (AD) [Entered: 11/15/2022 09:47 AM]
November 10, 2022 Filing 7 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Stephen M. Bosak for Appellant Washington County Water Company, Inc.. [7] [7272660] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-2942] (Bosak, Stephen) [Entered: 11/10/2022 10:25 AM]
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 12/29/2022 for Washington County Water Company, Inc.. Appellee's brief due on or before 01/30/2023 for City of Sparta. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 02/21/2023 for Appellant Washington County Water Company, Inc.. JB [7271882] [22-2942] (ER) [Entered: 11/07/2022 03:55 PM]
November 7, 2022 Filing 5 Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by Zoom, Tuesday, November 29, 2022 at 2:00 p.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JB. [5] [7271877] [22-2942] (ER) [Entered: 11/07/2022 03:53 PM]
October 31, 2022 Filing 4 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Christine E. Skoczylas for Appellee City of Sparta. [4] [7270064] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-2942] (Skoczylas, Christine) [Entered: 10/31/2022 11:44 AM]
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: This court received notice from the District Court that the appellant paid the required docketing fee. Briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 11/30/2022 for Washington County Water Company, Inc.. Appellee's brief due on or before 12/30/2022 for City of Sparta. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 01/20/2023 for Appellant Washington County Water Company, Inc. [3] [7270051] [22-2942] (CAG) [Entered: 10/31/2022 11:25 AM]
October 31, 2022 Filing 2 Filed notice from the District Court that the appeal docketing fee was received. [2] [7270049] [22-2942] (CAG) [Entered: 10/31/2022 11:24 AM]
October 28, 2022 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee due. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 11/14/2022. Fee or IFP forms due on 11/14/2022 for Appellant Washington County Water Company, Inc. [1] [7269869] [22-2942] (CG) [Entered: 10/28/2022 03:18 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Washington County Water Company, Inc. v. City of Sparta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WASHINGTON COUNTY WATER COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: Stephen M. Bosak Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY OF SPARTA
Represented By: Christine Skoczylas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?