Jadair International, Inc. v. American National Property & Casualty Company
Plaintiff / Appellant: JADAIR INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Defendant / Appellee: AMERICAN NATIONAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY COMPANY
Case Number: 22-3053
Filed: November 15, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 02/06/2023 for Jadair International, Inc.. Appellee's brief due on or before 03/13/2023 for American National Property & Casualty Company. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 04/03/2023 for Appellant Jadair International, Inc. JB [7282756] [22-3053] (CG) [Entered: 01/05/2023 08:47 AM]
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 01/23/2023 for Jadair International, Inc.. Appellee's brief due on or before 02/22/2023 for American National Property & Casualty Company. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 03/15/2023 for Appellant Jadair International, Inc.. JB [7277934] [22-3053] (HTP) [Entered: 12/08/2022 08:49 AM]
December 8, 2022 Filing 9 Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted via Zoom, Thursday, December 22, 2022 at 2:00pm. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JB. [9] [7277930] [22-3053] (HTP) [Entered: 12/08/2022 08:46 AM]
December 6, 2022 Filing 8 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Amanda C. Dure for Appellant Jadair International, Inc.. [8] [7277424] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [22-3053] [8] [7277424] [22-3053]--[Edited 12/06/2022 by HTP to reflect addition of counsel.] (Dure, Amanda) [Entered: 12/06/2022 11:44 AM]
December 6, 2022 Filing 7 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Douglas P. Desjardins for Appellant Jadair International, Inc.. [7] [7277419] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [22-3053] (Desjardins, Douglas) [Entered: 12/06/2022 11:41 AM]
December 6, 2022 Filing 6 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Russell A. Klingaman for Appellee American National Property & Casualty Company. [6] [7277391] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-3053] [6] [7277391] [22-3053]--[Edited 12/06/2022 by HTP to reflect addition of counsel.] (Klingaman, Russell) [Entered: 12/06/2022 10:17 AM]
December 5, 2022 Filing 5 Amended Statement of Jurisdiction filed by Appellant Jadair International, Inc.. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [5] [7277331] [22-3053] (Fetherston, Kevin) [Entered: 12/05/2022 04:56 PM]
December 5, 2022 Filing 4 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Corey J. Swinick for Appellee American National Property & Casualty Company. [4] [7277250] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-3053] (Swinick, Corey) [Entered: 12/05/2022 03:43 PM]
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: In the present case, plaintiff relies on diversity of citizenship for federal jurisdiction. However, appellants Circuit Rule 3(c) docketing statement fails to identify the amount in controversy and the state of citizenship of the parties. Appellant must provide this information. It is insufficient to cite 28 U.S.C. 1332. Accordingly, appellant file a complete statement of jurisdiction that includes the omitted information. The statement is due on or before December 6, 2022. (See order for further details.) DW [3] [7275940] [22-3053] (FP) [Entered: 11/30/2022 09:10 AM]
November 17, 2022 Filing 2 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Jadair International, Inc.. [2] [7273865] [22-3053] (Fetherston, Kevin) [Entered: 11/17/2022 10:59 AM]
November 15, 2022 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 11/29/2022. Appellant's brief due on or before 12/27/2022 for Jadair International, Inc. [1] [7273435] [22-3053] (ER) [Entered: 11/15/2022 11:56 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jadair International, Inc. v. American National Property & Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JADAIR INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: Douglas Desjardins
Represented By: Kevin Michael Fetherston
Represented By: Amanda C. Dure
Represented By: Douglas P. Desjardins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMERICAN NATIONAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY COMPANY
Represented By: Corey James Swinick
Represented By: Russell A. Klingaman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?