Charles Curry, Jr. v. Revolution Laboratories, LLC, et al
Plaintiff / Appellee: CHARLES CURRY, JR., doing business as GET DIESEL NUTRITION
Defendant / Appellant: REVOLUTION LABORATORIES, LLC, JOSHUA NUSSBAUM and BARRY NUSSBAUM
Case Number: 23-2850
Filed: September 25, 2023
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re: 1. Defendants/appellants' motion for emergency relief regarding defendants/appellants' motion for extension of time to file appellate brief. 2. Response to defendant-appellants' motion for extension of time. The request to suspend briefing is DENIED. The motion for extension of time is GRANTED. Briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 01/23/2024 for Barry Nussbaum, Joshua Nussbaum and Revolution Laboratories, LLC. Appellee's brief due on or before 02/22/2024 for Charles Curry Jr.. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 03/14/2024 for Appellants Barry Nussbaum, Joshua Nussbaum and Revolution Laboratories, LLC. Given the length of this extension of time, counsel for the appellants is expected to meet this deadline. [ # 11 ] JPK [13] [7349273] [23-2850] (CG) [Entered: 11/21/2023 03:47 PM]
November 20, 2023 Filing 12 Filed Response in Opposition by Appellee Mr. Charles Curry, Jr. to Appellants' Motion for Extension of Time (Dkts. 11-6 and 11-7). [12][7349009] [23-2850] (Kane, Jeffrey) [Entered: 11/20/2023 11:37 PM]
November 20, 2023 Filing 11 Emergency motion filed by Appellants Barry Nussbaum, Joshua Nussbaum and Revolution Laboratories, LLC to extend time to file appellant's brief. [11] [7348970] [23-2850] (MM) [Entered: 11/20/2023 04:42 PM]
November 1, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE: Circuit Rule 46(a) requires lead counsel be admitted to practice within 30 days of the date the appeal/petition was docketed. The rule also requires any attorney wishing to present oral argument to be admitted. Our records indicate as of this date Attorney Matthew De Preter for Appellants Revolution Laboratories, LLC, Joshua Nussbaum and Barry Nussbaum has/have not been admitted to practice in this court. Within 21 days, please file your application for admission by going to: https://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/forms/forms7.htm and choosing the link, "Application for Admission to Practice in the Seventh Circuit". [10] [7345212] [23-2850] (LJ) [Entered: 11/01/2023 09:41 AM]
October 13, 2023 Filing 9 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Nicholas Hailey for Appellee Mr. Charles Curry, Jr.. [9] [7341515] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [23-2850] [Edited 10/13/2023 by CG to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Hailey, Nicholas) [Entered: 10/13/2023 01:11 PM]
October 13, 2023 Filing 8 Amended Jurisdictional Statement filed by Appellants Barry Nussbaum, Joshua Nussbaum and Revolution Laboratories, LLC. [8] [7341378] [23-2850] (De Preter, Matthew) [Entered: 10/13/2023 08:33 AM]
October 12, 2023 Filing 7 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Matthew Oppenheim for Appellee Mr. Charles Curry, Jr.. [7] [7341318] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [23-2850][7] [7341318] [23-2850]--[Edited 10/12/2023 by HTP to reflect addition of counsel.] (Oppenheim, Matthew) [Entered: 10/12/2023 03:06 PM]
October 12, 2023 Filing 6 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Jeff Kane for Appellee Mr. Charles Curry, Jr.. [6] [7341311] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [23-2850] (Kane, Jeffrey) [Entered: 10/12/2023 02:55 PM]
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Appellants shall file a complete statement of jurisdiction that includes the correct date that the judgment and amended judgment were entered on the district court docket. The statement is due on or before October 18, 2023. (See order for details) DW [5] [7341010] [23-2850] (AP) [Entered: 10/11/2023 02:07 PM]
October 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellants' brief due on or before 11/24/2023 for Barry Nussbaum, Joshua Nussbaum and Revolution Laboratories, LLC. Appellee's brief due on or before 12/26/2023 for Charles Curry Jr.. Appellants' reply brief, if any, is due on or before 01/16/2024 for Appellants Barry Nussbaum, Joshua Nussbaum and Revolution Laboratories, LLC. JNS [7340313] [23-2850] (HTP) [Entered: 10/06/2023 08:49 AM]
October 6, 2023 Filing 3 Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Tuesday, October 24, 2023 at 1:30p.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JNS. [3] [7340311] [23-2850] (HTP) [Entered: 10/06/2023 08:46 AM]
September 29, 2023 Filing 2 Docketing Statement filed by Appellants Barry Nussbaum, Joshua Nussbaum and Revolution Laboratories, LLC. Prior or Related proceedings: Yes. Curry v. Revolution Laboratories, LLC et al., Appellate Case No. 17-2900 [2] [7339139] [23-2850] (De Preter, Matthew) [Entered: 09/29/2023 04:56 PM]
September 25, 2023 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellants Barry Nussbaum, Joshua Nussbaum and Revolution Laboratories, LLC by 09/29/2023. Transcript information sheet due by 10/10/2023. Appellant's brief due on or before 11/06/2023 for Barry Nussbaum, Joshua Nussbaum and Revolution Laboratories, LLC. [1] [7337681] [23-2850] (HTP) [Entered: 09/25/2023 01:04 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Charles Curry, Jr. v. Revolution Laboratories, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CHARLES CURRY, JR., doing business as GET DIESEL NUTRITION
Represented By: Jeffrey Kane
Represented By: Nicholas Cooper Hailey
Represented By: Matthew J. Oppenheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: REVOLUTION LABORATORIES, LLC
Represented By: Matthew De Preter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JOSHUA NUSSBAUM
Represented By: Matthew De Preter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: BARRY NUSSBAUM
Represented By: Matthew De Preter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?