Melanie Hoeg, et al v. Samsung Electronics America, Incorporated
Plaintiff: MELANIE HOEG, MELINDA GARCIA, 1025 OTHER INDIVIDUALS and ANGELA DAVIS
Defendant: SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INCORPORATED
Case Number: 24-1274
Filed: February 21, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
July 31, 2024 Melanie Hoeg v. Samsung Electronics America, Incorporated

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2024 Filing 22 Amended Docketing Statement filed by Appellees Melanie Hoeg, Melinda Garcia, Angela Davis and 1025 Other Individuals. Prior or Related proceedings: Yes. 23-2842 [22] [7371959] [24-1274] (Davidson, Stuart) [Entered: 03/25/2024 10:40 AM]
March 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Appellees shall provide a complete docketing statement no later than March 25, 2024. (See order for further details) JXK [21] [7370601] [24-1274] (PS) [Entered: 03/18/2024 10:39 AM]
March 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re: 1. Motion to stay the district courts order; request for administrative stay until the court rules; and motion to hold the appeal in abeyance. 2. Opposition to appellants motion to stay the district courts February 15, 2024 order for an administrative stay and to hold the appeal in abeyance. [ # 11 ] [ # 17 ] The motion for a stay pending appeal is GRANTED. The district court's order dated February 15, 2024, is STAYED pending the resolution of this appeal and the issuance of this courts mandate. Briefing in this appeal is SUSPENDED pending resolution of Wallrich v. Samsung Electronics America, Inc. , No. 23-2842. The parties shall file statements of position within 14 days of a decision in Wallrich . JXK [20] [7370586] [24-1274] (PS) [Entered: 03/18/2024 10:26 AM]
March 15, 2024 Filing 19 Amended Docketing Statement filed by Appellees Melanie Hoeg, Melinda Garcia, Angela Davis and 1025 Other Individuals. Prior or Related proceedings: Yes. 23-2842 [19] [7370311] [24-1274] (Davidson, Stuart) [Entered: 03/15/2024 10:15 AM]
March 15, 2024 Filing 18 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Alexander E. Wolf for Appellees Angela Davis, Melinda Garcia and Melanie Hoeg in 24-1274. [18] [7370306] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [24-1274, 23-2842] [Edited 03/15/2024 by CG to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Wolf, Alexander) [Entered: 03/15/2024 09:53 AM]
March 14, 2024 Filing 17 Filed Response in Opposition by Appellees 1025 Other Individuals, Angela Davis, Melinda Garcia and Melanie Hoeg in 24-1274, Appellees Jeffrey Burton, Grant Grinnell, Danielle Jones, Rhonda McCallum and Paula Wallrich in 23-2842 to Appellants' Motion to Stay the District Court's February 15, 2024 Order for an Administrative Stay and to Hold the Appeal in Abeyance. [17][7370181] [24-1274, 23-2842] (Klinger, Gary) [Entered: 03/14/2024 02:38 PM]
March 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Circuit Rule 3(c)(1) requires an appellee to provide a complete docketing statement if appellee contends that appellants docketing statement is not complete and correct. The appellees in the present case assert that appellants docketing statement is not complete and correct. But appellees have not provided the court with their own complete jurisdictional summary. It is insufficient to describe only those aspects of appellants jurisdictional statement that appellees believe to be incorrect and to state that appellees agree with other aspects. See Baez-Sanchez v. Sessions, 862 F.3d 638, 641 (7th Cir. 2017) (Wood, C.J., in chambers). Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that appellees shall provide a complete docketing statement no later than March 18, 2024. JXK [16] [7369297] [24-1274] (ER) [Entered: 03/11/2024 02:53 PM]
March 8, 2024 Filing 15 Docketing Statement filed by Appellees Melanie Hoeg, Melinda Garcia, Angela Davis and 1025 Other Individuals. Prior or Related proceedings: Yes. 23-2842 [15] [7368981] [24-1274] (Davidson, Stuart) [Entered: 03/08/2024 11:36 AM]
March 7, 2024 Filing 14 Filed Notice of district court's denial of motion for stay pending appeal by Appellant Samsung Electronics America, Incorporated. [14] [7368868] [24-1274] (Dvoretzky, Shay) [Entered: 03/07/2024 09:23 PM]
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re: Motion to stay the district courts order; request for administrative stay until the court rules; and motion to hold the appeal in abeyance. The district courts order dated February 15, 2024, is temporarily STAYED pending resolution of the motion to stay. Appellees shall file any response to the motion on or before March 14, 2024. JXK [13] [7368390] [24-1274] (HTP) [Entered: 03/06/2024 09:43 AM]
March 6, 2024 Filing 12 Filed Statement by Appellant Samsung Electronics America, Incorporated to Order of February 22, 2024. [12][7368383] [24-1274] (Dvoretzky, Shay) [Entered: 03/06/2024 09:26 AM]
March 4, 2024 Filing 11 Motion filed by Appellant Samsung Electronics America, Incorporated for stay of the District Court's Order., for an administrative stay until the Court rules, and to hold the appeal in abeyance. [11] [7367949] [24-1274] (Dvoretzky, Shay) [Entered: 03/04/2024 03:31 PM]
March 4, 2024 Filing 10 Added Attorney(s) Gary M. Klinger for party(s) Appellee Melanie Hoeg Appellee Angela Davis Appellee Melinda Garcia, in case 24-1274 per disclosure statement. Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Gary M. Klinger for Appellees 1025 Other Individuals, Melanie Hoeg, Melinda Garcia and Angela Davis in 24-1274. [10] [7367899] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [24-1274, 23-2842]--[Edited 03/04/2024 by AD to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Klinger, Gary) [Entered: 03/04/2024 02:07 PM]
February 27, 2024 Filing 9 Filed Statement by Appellees Melanie Hoeg, Melinda Garcia, Angela Davis and 1025 Other Individuals to Order of February 22, 2024, ECF 4. [9][7366961] [24-1274] (Davidson, Stuart) [Entered: 02/27/2024 02:05 PM]
February 26, 2024 Filing 8 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Douglas S. Wilens for Appellees Melanie Hoeg, Melinda Garcia, Angela Davis and 1025 Other Individuals. [8] [7366576] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [24-1274]--[Edited 02/26/2024 by FP to reflect that atty. Wilens is added to the docket.] (Wilens, Douglas) [Entered: 02/26/2024 01:58 PM]
February 26, 2024 Filing 7 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Samsung Electronics America, Incorporated. Prior or Related proceedings: Yes. 23-2842 [7] [7366475] [24-1274] (Dvoretzky, Shay) [Entered: 02/26/2024 11:28 AM]
February 23, 2024 Filing 6 Filed Response by Appellees Melanie Hoeg, Melinda Garcia, Angela Davis and 1025 Other Individuals to Appellants' Citation of Additional Authority. [6][7366205] [24-1274] (Davidson, Stuart) [Entered: 02/23/2024 10:32 AM]
February 23, 2024 Filing 5 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Stuart A. Davidson for Appellees 1025 Other Individuals, Angela Davis, Melinda Garcia and Melanie Hoeg. [5] [7366159] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [24-1274]--[Edited 02/23/2024 by FP to reflect that atty. Davidson is added to the docket.] (Davidson, Stuart) [Entered: 02/23/2024 08:54 AM]
February 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: A preliminary review of the short record indicates that the district court has not entered a Rule 58 judgment. Accordingly, both appellant and appellees shall file, on or before March 6, 2024, a statement advising the court whether they will request the district court that judgment be set out in a separate document. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 58(d). DW [4] [7366089] [24-1274] (AD) [Entered: 02/22/2024 04:13 PM]
February 22, 2024 Filing 3 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Samsung Electronics America, Incorporated. [3] [7366070] [24-1274] (Dvoretzky, Shay) [Entered: 02/22/2024 03:40 PM]
February 22, 2024 Filing 2 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorneys Shay Dvoretzky; Parker Rider-Longmaid; Kyser Blakely; Michael W. McTigue Jr.; Meredith C. Slawe; Kurt Wm. Hemr; Colm P. McInerney; Jeremy Patashnik; Randall W. Edwards; Matthew D. Powers; Jonathan D. Hacker; Ashley M. Pavel for Appellant Samsung Electronics America, Incorporated. [2] [7365987] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [24-1274] [Edited 02/22/2024 by CG to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Dvoretzky, Shay) [Entered: 02/22/2024 01:27 PM]
February 21, 2024 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Samsung Electronics America, Incorporated by 02/28/2024. Transcript information sheet due by 03/06/2024. Appellant's brief due on or before 04/01/2024 for Samsung Electronics America, Incorporated. [1] [7365879] [24-1274] (MAN) [Entered: 02/22/2024 10:32 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Melanie Hoeg, et al v. Samsung Electronics America, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELANIE HOEG
Represented By: Alexander C. Cohen
Represented By: Stuart Andrew Davidson
Represented By: Gary M. Klinger
Represented By: Douglas S. Wilens
Represented By: Alexander E. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELINDA GARCIA
Represented By: Alexander C. Cohen
Represented By: Stuart Andrew Davidson
Represented By: Gary M. Klinger
Represented By: Douglas S. Wilens
Represented By: Alexander E. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1025 OTHER INDIVIDUALS
Represented By: Alexander C. Cohen
Represented By: Stuart Andrew Davidson
Represented By: Douglas S. Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELA DAVIS
Represented By: Alexander C. Cohen
Represented By: Stuart Andrew Davidson
Represented By: Gary M. Klinger
Represented By: Douglas S. Wilens
Represented By: Alexander E. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INCORPORATED
Represented By: Kyser Blakely
Represented By: Shay Dvoretzky
Represented By: Randall Edwards
Represented By: Jonathan Hacker
Represented By: Kurt Hemr
Represented By: Colm P. McInerney I
Represented By: Michael Wayne McTigue Jr.
Represented By: Jeremy Patashnik
Represented By: Ashley M. Pavel
Represented By: Matthew Powers
Represented By: Parker Andrew Rider-Longmaid
Represented By: Meredith C. Slawe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?