Kevin Brooks v. Josh Richardson, et al
Plaintiff: KEVIN BROOKS
Defendant: JOSH RICHARDSON, BRYANT MCGEE, LESLEE D. BROOKS, E. HARBISON and MELISSA SCHREIBER
Case Number: 24-1651
Filed: April 22, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2024 Filing 9 Appellant's brief filed by Appellant Kevin Brooks. Paper copies due on 06/24/2024. REMINDER: If a case is designated to proceed to oral argument, hearing notices will be mailed shortly before the date of oral argument. Please note that counsel's unavailability for oral argument must be submitted by letter, filed electronically with the Clerk's Office, no later than the filing of the appellant's brief in a criminal case and the filing of an appellee's brief in a civil case. See Cir. R. 34(b)(3). The court's calendar is located at https://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/cal/argcalendar.pdf. Once scheduled, oral argument is rescheduled only in extraordinary circumstances. See Cir. R. 34(b)(4), (e). [9] [7388569] [24-1651] (DAB) [Entered: 06/18/2024 09:03 AM]
June 17, 2024 Filing 8 Submitted appellant brief by Nora Snyder for Appellant Kevin Brooks. [8] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [7388554] [24-1651] (Snyder, Nora) [Entered: 06/17/2024 08:44 PM]
June 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 06/17/2024 for Kevin Brooks. Appellees' brief due on or before 07/24/2024 for Leslee D. Brooks, E. Harbison, Bryant McGee, Josh Richardson and Melissa Schreiber. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 08/14/2024 for Appellant Kevin Brooks. JB [7386466] [24-1651] (HTP) [Entered: 06/06/2024 07:22 AM]
May 13, 2024 Filing 6 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Jan Susler for Appellant Kevin Brooks. [6] [7381814] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [24-1651] [Edited 05/13/2024 by CG to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Susler, Janis) [Entered: 05/13/2024 10:59 AM]
April 25, 2024 Filing 5 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Janine L. Hoft for Appellant Kevin Brooks. [5] [7378741] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [24-1651]--[Edited 04/26/2024 by FP- to reflect that atty. Hoft is added to the docket.] (Hoft, Janine) [Entered: 04/25/2024 05:48 PM]
April 25, 2024 Filing 4 Added Attorney Nora P. Snyder for Appellant Kevin Brooks, in case 24-1651 per disclosure statement. Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Nora Snyder for Appellant Kevin Brooks. [4] [7378616] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [24-1651]--[Edited 04/25/2024 by MAN to reflect addition of counsel] (Snyder, Nora) [Entered: 04/25/2024 12:08 PM]
April 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 06/10/2024 for Kevin Brooks. Appellees' brief due on or before 07/10/2024 for Leslee D. Brooks, E. Harbison, Bryant McGee, Josh Richardson and Melissa Schreiber. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 07/31/2024 for Appellant Kevin Brooks. JB [7378383] [24-1651] (HTP) [Entered: 04/24/2024 12:47 PM]
April 24, 2024 Filing 2 Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted via Zoom, Thursday, May 9, 2024 at 10:00am. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JB. [2] [7378380] [24-1651] (HTP) [Entered: 04/24/2024 12:45 PM]
April 22, 2024 Filing 1 U.S. civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 05/06/2024. Appellant's brief due on or before 06/03/2024 for Kevin Brooks [1] [7377833] [24-1651] (AP) [Entered: 04/22/2024 03:11 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Kevin Brooks v. Josh Richardson, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN BROOKS
Represented By: Janine L. Hoft
Represented By: Janis M. Susler
Represented By: Nora P. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSH RICHARDSON
Represented By: Alex H. Hartzler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRYANT MCGEE
Represented By: Alex H. Hartzler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LESLEE D. BROOKS
Represented By: Alex H. Hartzler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. HARBISON
Represented By: Alex H. Hartzler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MELISSA SCHREIBER
Represented By: Alex H. Hartzler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?