Timothy Stewart, Sr. v. Drew Severson, et al
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY L. STEWART, SR.
Defendant: DREW SEVERSON, AISHA BRUNTON, MICHAEL PALMER and JASON BIER
Case Number: 24-1653
Filed: April 22, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2024 Filing 13 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Timothy L. Stewart, Sr. [13] [7385199] [24-1653] (FP) [Entered: 05/29/2024 02:14 PM]
May 28, 2024 Filing 12 Appellees' objection to Appellant's Rule 3 docketing statement. Docketing Statement filed by Appellees Jason Bier and Drew Severson. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [12] [7384845] [24-1653]--[Edited 05/28/2024 by CG to reflect correct document filed.] (Truesdale, Ryan) [Entered: 05/28/2024 12:39 PM]
May 28, 2024 Filing 11 Filed Certificate of Service to Appellees' Joint Objection and Declaration of Ryan J. Truesdale and exhibit 1-10. filed on 05/28/2024 by Appellees Drew Severson and Jason Bier. [11] [7384840] [24-1653] (Truesdale, Ryan) [Entered: 05/28/2024 12:31 PM]
May 28, 2024 Filing 10 Docketing Statement filed by Appellees Jason Bier and Drew Severson. Prior or Related proceedings: No. Declaration of Ryan J. Truesdale [10] [7384838] [24-1653]--[Edited 05/28/2024 by CG to reflect correct document filed.] (Truesdale, Ryan) [Entered: 05/28/2024 12:29 PM]
May 21, 2024 Filing 9 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Timothy L. Stewart, Sr. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [9] [7383531] [24-1653] (CG) [Entered: 05/21/2024 08:57 AM]
May 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The court, on its own motion, orders appellant to show cause for his failure to respond to the court's order of April 22, 2024. Appellant shall file his response on or before May 28, 2024. Appellant is advised that failure to respond may result in the dismissal of this appeal as appellees requested in their May 1, 2024, filing. The clerk of this court shall attach a copy of the April 22, 2024, order to appellant's copy of this order. JXK Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7021 2720 0001 0402 8316. [8] [7382186] [24-1653] (AP) [Entered: 05/14/2024 10:50 AM]
May 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Appellant Timothy L. Stewart, Sr. is directed to file the overdue Docketing Statement within 14 days from the date of this Rule to Show Cause. Docketing statement response due for Appellant Timothy L. Stewart Sr. by 05/20/2024. Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7022 0410 0003 3396 2338. [7] [7380627] [24-1653] (AD) [Entered: 05/06/2024 01:17 PM]
May 1, 2024 Filing 6 Filed Certificate of Service to Document 5- APPELLEES' BRIEF OPPOSING STAYING THE APPEAL filed on 05/01/2024 by Appellees Jason Bier, Aisha Brunton, Michael Palmer and Drew Severson. [6] [7379671] [24-1653] (Truesdale, Ryan) [Entered: 05/01/2024 01:00 PM]
May 1, 2024 Filing 5 Appellees brief opposing staying the appeal, in response to the Courts April 22, 2024, order. Submitted appellee brief by Ryan J. Truesdale and Amy J. Doyle for Appellees Jason Bier, Drew Severson, Aisha Brunton and Michael Palmer. [5] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [7379533] [24-1653]--[Edited 05/01/2024 by PS - to correct docket text.] (Truesdale, Ryan) [Entered: 05/01/2024 08:54 AM]
April 29, 2024 Filing 4 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Timothy L. Stewart, Sr. [4] [7379055] [24-1653] (AD) [Entered: 04/29/2024 10:12 AM]
April 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: A review of the short record reveals that this appeal involves more than one appellee represented by different counsel. Counsel for appellees are encouraged to file a joint brief and appendix or adopt parts of a co-appellee's brief. The parties are reminded that redundant and uncoordinated briefing will be stricken. See United States v. Torres, 170 F.3d 749 (7th Cir. 1999); United States v. Ashman, 964 F.2d 596 (7th Cir. 1992). [7378042] DW [3] [7378042] [24-1653] (CG) [Entered: 04/23/2024 11:02 AM]
April 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: A preliminary review of the short record indicates that the order appealed from may not be a final appealable judgment within the meaning of 28 U.S.C. 1291. A notice of appeal filed before the district court issues its ruling on a timely motion under Rule 59 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedureor a motion under Rule 60 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed within the time available for a Rule 59 motionis ineffective until the order disposing of the motion is entered on the district courts civil docket. Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(4). In the present case, appellant filed motions to reopen the case on March 4, 2024, within 28 days of entry of judgment on March 1, 2024. These may be timely motions under Rule 59 or Rule 60. See Carlson v. CSX Transp., Inc., 758 F.3d 819, 82526 (7th Cir. 2014); Florian v. Sequa Corp., 294 F.3d 828, 829 (7th Cir. 2002). As such, this appeal may be premature, because it appears that the district court has not disposed of the motion and entered its order on the district courts civil docket. Accordingly, appellant and appellees each shall file, on or before May 6, 2024, a brief memorandum stating why this appeal should not be STAYED pending the entry of the order disposing of the motion. A motion for voluntary dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) from appellant will satisfy this requirement. Briefing is SUSPENDED pending further court order. JXK [2] [2] [7377861] [24-1653] (HTP) [Entered: 04/22/2024 03:46 PM]
April 22, 2024 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. IFP pending in the District Court. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Timothy L. Stewart Sr. by 04/26/2024. Transcript information sheet due by 05/06/2024. [1] [7377760] [24-1653] (CG) [Entered: 04/22/2024 12:14 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Timothy Stewart, Sr. v. Drew Severson, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY L. STEWART, SR.
Represented By: Timothy L. Stewart Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DREW SEVERSON
Represented By: Ryan Truesdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AISHA BRUNTON
Represented By: Amy J. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL PALMER
Represented By: Amy J. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JASON BIER
Represented By: Ryan Truesdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?