Brandy Bond v. Jennifer Nichols, et al
Plaintiff: BRANDY L. BOND
Defendant: JENNIFER NICHOLS and CNA NIKKI
Case Number: 24-1681
Filed: April 23, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER issued DISMISSING this appeal for lack of jurisdiction and appellant's motion to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED. (See order for further details) [ # 12 ] Frank H. Easterbrook, Circuit Judge; David F. Hamilton, Circuit Judge and John Z. Lee, Circuit Judge. [13] [7386702] [24-1681] (AD) [Entered: 06/06/2024 03:30 PM]
May 23, 2024 Filing 12 Prose motion filed by Appellant Brandy L. Bond to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. [12] [7384301] [24-1681] (DAB) [Entered: 05/23/2024 03:20 PM]
May 17, 2024 Filing 11 Filed Memorandum by Appellee Jennifer Nichols to Appellee's Jurisdictional Memorandum Pursuant to this Court's May 9, 2024 Order. [11][7383065] [24-1681] (Tidwall, Karen) [Entered: 05/17/2024 01:43 PM]
May 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file response.The appellee may file a response to the appellants jurisdictional memorandum by May 17, 2024. [ # 9 ] SCR [10] [7382991] [24-1681] (FP) [Entered: 05/17/2024 10:22 AM]
May 16, 2024 Filing 9 Motion filed by Appellee Jennifer Nichols to extend time to file the response [9] [7382836] [24-1681] (Tidwall, Karen) [Entered: 05/16/2024 03:08 PM]
May 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Appellee shall file, on or before May 16, 2024, a response to appellants jurisdictional memorandum, addressing the jurisdictional issue raised in the courts order of April 24, 2024. DW [8] [7381375] [24-1681] (AD) [Entered: 05/09/2024 10:47 AM]
May 8, 2024 Filing 7 Filed Appellant Brandy L. Bond Jurisdictional Memorandum. [7] [7381262] [24-1681] (DAB) [Entered: 05/08/2024 03:57 PM]
May 8, 2024 Filing 6 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Brandy L. Bond. [6] [7381260] [24-1681] (DAB) [Entered: 05/08/2024 03:56 PM]
April 29, 2024 Filing 5 Filed District Court order DENYING Appellant Brandy L. Bond leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Date IFP denied: 04/29/2024. Issued Circuit Rule 3(b) 30 day notice for failure to pay the docketing fee. Fee or IFP forms due on 05/29/2024 for Appellant Brandy L. Bond [7379345] [5] [7379345] [24-1681] (AP) [Entered: 04/30/2024 11:14 AM]
April 29, 2024 Filing 4 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Brandy L. Bond. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [4] [7379201] [24-1681] (EF) [Entered: 04/29/2024 03:41 PM]
April 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The appellant shall file, on or before May 8, 2024, a brief memorandum stating why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. A motion for voluntary dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) will satisfy this requirement. Briefing is SUSPENDED pending further court order. (See order for further details) [7378384] JXK [3] [7378384] [24-1681] (AP) [Entered: 04/24/2024 12:51 PM]
April 23, 2024 Filing 2 No attorney(s) added for Appellee CNA Nikki, per District Court docket and information sheet. [2] [7378261] [24-1681] (MAN) [Entered: 04/24/2024 09:19 AM]
April 23, 2024 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. IFP pending in the District Court. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Brandy L. Bond by 04/30/2024. Transcript information sheet due by 05/07/2024. [1] [7378257] [24-1681] (MAN) [Entered: 04/24/2024 09:16 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Brandy Bond v. Jennifer Nichols, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRANDY L. BOND
Represented By: Brandy L. Bond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JENNIFER NICHOLS
Represented By: Karen L. Tidwall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNA NIKKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?