Kelsey Smith v. Michael Whitsel
Plaintiff: KELSEY JILL SMITH, as Administrator of the Estate of Dalynn Kee, and on behalf of her Next of Kin
Defendant: MICHAEL WHITSEL
Case Number: 24-1694
Filed: April 24, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing is SUSPENDED pending further court order. [8] [7387576] [24-1694] (CG) [Entered: 06/12/2024 12:32 PM]
May 1, 2024 Filing 7 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney MATTHEW B. KNIGHT for Appellant Michael Whitsel. [7] [7379734] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [24-1694] -[Edited 05/01/2024 by ER - added Attorney Matthew B. Knight.] (Knight, Matthew) [Entered: 05/01/2024 03:02 PM]
May 1, 2024 Filing 6 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Michael Whitsel. [6] [7379727] [24-1694] (Atkus, Michael) [Entered: 05/01/2024 02:59 PM]
May 1, 2024 Filing 5 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Michael Whitsel. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [5] [7379725] [24-1694] (Atkus, Michael) [Entered: 05/01/2024 02:58 PM]
May 1, 2024 Filing 4 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney MICHAEL J. ATKUS for Appellant Michael Whitsel. [4] [7379724] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [24-1694] (Atkus, Michael) [Entered: 05/01/2024 02:57 PM]
April 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 07/12/2024 for Michael Whitsel. Appellee's brief due on or before 08/12/2024 for Kelsey Jill Smith. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 09/03/2024 for Appellant Michael Whitsel. JB [7378812] [24-1694] (MAN) [Entered: 04/26/2024 10:18 AM]
April 26, 2024 Filing 2 Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted via Zoom, Wednesday, June 12, 2024 at 10:00a.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JB. [2] [7378810] [24-1694] (MAN) [Entered: 04/26/2024 10:17 AM]
April 24, 2024 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Michael Whitsel by 05/01/2024. Transcript information sheet due by 05/08/2024. Appellant's brief due on or before 06/03/2024 for Michael Whitsel. [1] [7378570] [24-1694] (HTP) [Entered: 04/25/2024 09:58 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Kelsey Smith v. Michael Whitsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KELSEY JILL SMITH, as Administrator of the Estate of Dalynn Kee, and on behalf of her Next of Kin
Represented By: Frederick J. Schlosser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL WHITSEL
Represented By: Michael J. Atkus
Represented By: Matthew B. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?