Jane Doe v. Richard Macleod, et al
Plaintiff: JANE DOE
Defendant: MARGARET BURKE, TODD SEXTON and RICHARD MACLEOD
Case Number: 24-1696
Filed: April 25, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER issued GRANTING Defendants-Appellants/Cross-Appellees' Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief. [ # 12 ] Main appeal brief due on or before 07/17/2024 for Margaret Burke and Todd Sexton. Appellee Cross-Appellant brief due on or before 08/16/2024 for Jane Doe. Appellant Reply Cross-Appellee brief due by 09/16/2024 for Appellants Margaret Burke and Todd Sexton. Reply Brief in Cross Appeal due by 10/07/2024 for Appellant Jane Doe. CDH [13] [7387750] [23-3060, 24-1696] (AD) [Entered: 06/13/2024 10:18 AM]
June 10, 2024 Filing 12 Motion filed by Appellants Margaret Burke and Todd Sexton in 23-3060, Appellees Margaret Burke and Todd Sexton in 24-1696 to extend time to file appellant main brief in cross-appeal brief. [12] [7387230] [23-3060, 24-1696] (Chenevert, Kaitlyn) [Entered: 06/10/2024 06:59 PM]
June 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the motion to waive the bond requirement and stay execution of the judgment is GRANTED. Execution on the judgment is STAYED pending this courts resolution of the appeal and issuance of the mandate. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion to stay this appeal pending this courts resolution Walton v. Nehls, No. 23-1207 is DENIED. (Judge Rovner voted to deny the motion to waive the bond requirement to stay execution of judgment.) [ # 7381582-2 ] CMM [11] [7387129] [23-3060, 24-1696] (ER) [Entered: 06/10/2024 02:58 PM]
June 10, 2024 FOR COURT USE ONLY: Certified copy of 06/10/2024 Bond Order sent to the District Court Clerk. [7387181-2] [7387181] [23-3060, 24-1696] (ER) [Entered: 06/10/2024 04:03 PM]
May 23, 2024 Filing 10 Filed Opposition by Appellee Jane Doe in 23-3060 to Defendants' Motion to Stay Execution of the Judgement and Waive Bond, and to Stay Appeal Pending Walton v. Nehls. [10][7384324] [23-3060, 24-1696] (Cramer, Britt) [Entered: 05/23/2024 04:29 PM]
May 20, 2024 Filing 9 Added Attorney Kasdin Miller Mitchell for Appellee Jane Doe, in case 23-3060 per disclosure statement. Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Kasdin Miller Mitchell for Appellee Jane Doe in 23-3060. [9] [7383444] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [23-3060, 24-1696]--[Edited 05/20/2024 by MAN to reflect addition of counsel] (Mitchell, Kasdin) [Entered: 05/20/2024 03:27 PM]
May 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Filed clerk's notice to Appellee Jane Doe in 23-3060, Appellant Jane Doe in 24-1696 to file a response to DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY EXECUTION OF THE JUDGMENT AND TO WAIVE BOND REQUIREMENT AS TO DEFENDANTS-APPELLANTS, AND TO STAY APPEAL PENDING THIS COURT'S DECISION IN WALTON V. NEHLS. Response due for Jane Doe by 05/23/2024. CMM [8] [7382830] [23-3060, 24-1696] (ER) [Entered: 05/16/2024 02:54 PM]
May 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order issued GRANTING motion for extension of time to file brief. [ # 6 ] Main appeal brief due on or before 06/17/2024 for Margaret Burke and Todd Sexton. Appellee Cross-Appellant brief due on or before 07/17/2024 for Jane Doe. Appellants Reply Cross-Appellees brief due by 08/16/2024 for Appellants Margaret Burke and Todd Sexton. Reply Brief in Cross Appeal due by 09/06/2024 for Appellant Jane Doe. CDH [7] [7382437] [23-3060, 24-1696] (ER) [Entered: 05/15/2024 11:11 AM]
May 9, 2024 Filing 6 Motion filed by Appellants Margaret Burke and Todd Sexton in 23-3060, Appellees Margaret Burke and Todd Sexton in 24-1696 to extend time to file appellant brief. [6] [7381500] [23-3060, 24-1696] (Chenevert, Kaitlyn) [Entered: 05/09/2024 06:31 PM]
May 9, 2024 Filing 5 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellee Jane Doe in 23-3060. [5] [7381433] [24-1696, 23-3060] (Schult, Nicole) [Entered: 05/09/2024 01:09 PM]
May 2, 2024 Filing 4 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Jane Doe. Prior or Related proceedings: Yes. 23-3060 [4] [7379983] [24-1696] (Schult, Nicole) [Entered: 05/02/2024 02:39 PM]
April 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The court orders these appeals CONSOLIDATED for purposes of briefing and disposition: Main appeal brief due on or before 05/16/2024 for Margaret Burke and Todd Sexton. Appellee Cross-Appellant brief due on or before 06/17/2024 for Jane Doe. Appellant Reply Cross-Appellee brief due by 07/17/2024 for Appellants Margaret Burke and Todd Sexton. Reply Brief in Cross Appeal due by 08/07/2024 for Appellant Jane Doe. JXK [3] [7378715] [23-3060, 24-1696] (ER) [Entered: 04/25/2024 04:00 PM]
April 25, 2024 Filing 2 No attorney(s) added for Appellee Richard Macleod, per District Court docket and information sheet. [2] [7378626] [24-1696] (ER) [Entered: 04/25/2024 12:25 PM]
April 25, 2024 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Jane Doe by 05/02/2024. Transcript information sheet due by 05/09/2024. Appellant's brief due on or before 06/04/2024 for Jane Doe. [1] [7378624] [24-1696] (ER) [Entered: 04/25/2024 12:20 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jane Doe v. Richard Macleod, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANE DOE
Represented By: Nicole Schult
Represented By: Britt Cramer
Represented By: Alan S. Mills
Represented By: Christina E. Sharkey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARGARET BURKE
Represented By: Kaitlyn Noel Chenevert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TODD SEXTON
Represented By: Kaitlyn Noel Chenevert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD MACLEOD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?