Pearl Henyard v. CTA, et al
Plaintiff: PEARL HENYARD
Defendant: CHICAGO TRANSIT AUTHORITY and PACE
Case Number: 24-1702
Filed: April 25, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: To the extent that the appellant seeks to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis, a review of the docket indicates that the paperwork she has filed to date is incomplete because it does not include an asset affidavit. Accordingly, the appellant shall file the required asset affidavit by July 10, 2024. The clerk shall send the appellant an asset affidavit form. CDH [13] [7387049] [24-1702] (FP) [Entered: 06/10/2024 11:43 AM]
June 7, 2024 Filing 12 Prose motion filed by Appellant Ms. Pearl Henyard to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. [12] [7386856] [24-1702] (CAH) [Entered: 06/07/2024 02:12 PM]
June 4, 2024 Filing 11 1 copy of appellant's brief filed by Appellant Ms. Pearl Henyard. REMINDER: If a case is designated to proceed to oral argument, hearing notices will be mailed shortly before the date of oral argument. Please note that counsel's unavailability for oral argument must be submitted by letter, filed electronically with the Clerk's Office, no later than the filing of the appellant's brief in a criminal case and the filing of an appellee's brief in a civil case. See Cir. R. 34(b)(3). The court's calendar is located at https://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/cal/argcalendar.pdf. Once scheduled, oral argument is rescheduled only in extraordinary circumstances. See Cir. R. 34(b)(4), (e). [11] [7386231] [24-1702] (EF) [Entered: 06/04/2024 04:54 PM]
May 29, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE: Circuit Rule 46(a) requires lead counsel be admitted to practice within 30 days of the date the appeal/petition was docketed. The rule also requires any attorney wishing to present oral argument to be admitted. Our records indicate as of this date Attorney Thomas Vincent-Paul Draths for Appellee Pace has/have not been admitted to practice in this court. Within 21 days, please file your application for admission by going to: https://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/forms/forms7.htm and choosing the link, "Application for Admission to Practice in the Seventh Circuit". [10] [7385100] [24-1702] (LJ) [Entered: 05/29/2024 10:26 AM]
May 17, 2024 Filing 9 Docketing Statement filed by Appellees CTA and Pace. Prior or Related proceedings: Yes. 20-3462 and 21-2141 [9] [7382984] [24-1702] (Nelligan, Brendan) [Entered: 05/17/2024 10:08 AM]
May 17, 2024 Filing 8 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Ms. Pearl Henyard. [8] [7382937] [24-1702] (AP) [Entered: 05/17/2024 09:25 AM]
May 3, 2024 Filing 7 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Ms. Pearl Henyard. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [7] [7380329] [24-1702] (DAB) [Entered: 05/03/2024 03:09 PM]
May 3, 2024 Filing 6 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by pro se party Ms. Pearl Henyard. [6] [7380327] [24-1702] (DAB) [Entered: 05/03/2024 03:07 PM]
May 2, 2024 Filing 5 Filed District Court order DENYING Appellant Ms. Pearl Henyard leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Date IFP denied: 05/01/2024. Issued Circuit Rule 3(b) 30 day notice for failure to pay the docketing fee. Fee or IFP forms due on 06/03/2024 for Appellant Pearl Henyard. [7379820] [5] [7379820] [24-1702] (CG) [Entered: 05/02/2024 08:48 AM]
April 30, 2024 Filing 4 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Brendan J. Nelligan for Appellee Pace. [4] [7379507] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [24-1702]--[Edited 04/30/2024 by PS - to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Nelligan, Brendan) [Entered: 04/30/2024 04:33 PM]
April 30, 2024 Filing 3 Appearance form filed by Attorney Irina Dmitrieva for Appellee CTA. [3] [7379326] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [24-1702]--[Edited 04/30/2024 by PS - to reflect the termination and addition of counsel.] (Dmitrieva, Irina) [Entered: 04/30/2024 10:21 AM]
April 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: A review of the short record reveals that this appeal involves more than one appellee represented by different counsel. Counsel for appellees are encouraged to file a joint brief and appendix or adopt parts of a co-appellee's brief. The parties are reminded that redundant and uncoordinated briefing will be stricken. See United States v. Torres, 170 F.3d 749 (7th Cir. 1999); United States v. Ashman, 964 F.2d 596 (7th Cir. 1992). [7378814] [2] [7378814] [24-1702] (HTP) [Entered: 04/26/2024 10:22 AM]
April 25, 2024 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. IFP pending in the District Court. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Pearl Henyard by 05/01/2024. Transcript information sheet due by 05/09/2024. [1] [7378808] [24-1702] (HTP) [Entered: 04/26/2024 10:15 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Pearl Henyard v. CTA, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PEARL HENYARD
Represented By: Pearl Henyard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHICAGO TRANSIT AUTHORITY
Represented By: Irina Y. Dmitrieva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PACE
Represented By: Thomas Vincent-Paul Draths
Represented By: Brendan J. Nelligan
Represented By: Thomas V.P. Draths
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?